This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2021 at 09:30:38 (UTC).

Elva Benson v. Enterprise Leasing Company of, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Elva Benson filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Enterprise Leasing Company of. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11911

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF ORLANDO, LLC

ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

ELVA BENSON, on behalf of themselves and on behalf of all others similarly-situated

Not Classified By Court

CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

NATIONAL RETAIL FEDERATION

RESTAURANT LAW CENTER

ACADEMY OF FLORIDA MANAGEMENT ATTORNEYS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael D. Leffel

Attorney at Foley & Lardner, LLP

150 E Gilman St Ste 5000

Madison, WI 53703-1482

Christina M. Kennedy

Attorney at Foley & Lardner, LLP

2 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Jason C. Schwartz

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave Nw Fl 3

Washington, DC 20036

Brian Alan Richman

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave Nw Fl 3

Washington, DC 20036

Ryan Stewart

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave Nw Fl 3

Washington, DC 20036

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Luis Antonio Cabassa

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602

Brandon Hill

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Philip Andrew Miscimarra

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2541

Kristen Marie Fiore

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

201 E Park Ave Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Arlene Karin Kline

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

777 S Flagler Dr Ste 1100 W Twr

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-6143

 

Court Documents

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion [ # 9443823-2 ] filed by Attorney Brandon Hill for Appellee Elva Benson. [21-11911] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 08/02/2021 08:35 PM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit A Amicus Brief

Open Document #1

Notice of Filing Proposed Amicus Brief

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion [ # 9441411-2 ] filed by Attorney Brandon Hill for Appellee Elva Benson. [21-11911] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 07/30/2021 05:05 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Kristen Fiore for The Academy of Florida Management Attorneys. [9448821-1] [21-11911] (ECF: Kristen Fiore) [Entered: 07/30/2021 12:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Luis Antonio Cabassa for Elva Benson. [21-11911] (ECF: Luis Cabassa) [Entered: 07/27/2021 12:55 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brandon Hill for Elva Benson. [21-11911] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 07/27/2021 12:52 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arlene K. Kline for The Academy of Florida Management Attorneys [21-11911] (ECF: Arlene Kline) [Entered: 07/26/2021 09:12 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jason C. Schwartz for Appellants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. [21-11911] (ECF: Jason Schwartz) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:17 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jason C. Schwartz for Appellants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11911] (ECF: Jason Schwartz) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:15 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Alan Richman for Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. [21-11911] (ECF: Brian Richman) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:13 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ryan C. Stewart for Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. [21-11911] (ECF: Ryan Stewart) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:10 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason C. Schwartz for Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. [21-11911] (ECF: Jason Schwartz) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:07 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. The appellants' brief is due on or before 07/14/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellants' brief. [Entered: 06/09/2021 02:08 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 06/09/2021 as to Appellant Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. [Entered: 06/09/2021 12:17 PM]

Open Document #3

Petition for Permission to Appeal

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Motion [ # 9443823-2 ] filed by Attorney Brandon Hill for Appellee Elva Benson. [21-11911] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 08/02/2021 08:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Kristen M. Fiore for The Academy of Florida Management Attorneys. [9449215-1] [21-11911] (ECF: Kristen Fiore) [Entered: 07/30/2021 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDeficiency notice issued to Kristen Marie Fiore and Arlene Karin Kline for Academy of Florida Management Attorneys. The motion to file an amicus brief and the amicus brief should be separately attached in the docket entry. [Entered: 07/30/2021 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Motion [ # 9441411-2 ] filed by Attorney Brandon Hill for Appellee Elva Benson. [21-11911] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 07/30/2021 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Kristen Fiore for The Academy of Florida Management Attorneys. [9448821-1] [21-11911] (ECF: Kristen Fiore) [Entered: 07/30/2021 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief submitted by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Retail Federation and Restaurant Law Center. [Entered: 07/28/2021 05:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOver the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Brandon Hill for Appellee Elva Benson. Appellee's Brief due on 08/27/2021 as to Appellee Elva Benson.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 07/27/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Luis Antonio Cabassa for Elva Benson. [21-11911] (ECF: Luis Cabassa) [Entered: 07/27/2021 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brandon Hill for Elva Benson. [21-11911] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 07/27/2021 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arlene K. Kline for The Academy of Florida Management Attorneys [21-11911] (ECF: Arlene Kline) [Entered: 07/26/2021 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 06/17/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jason C. Schwartz for Appellants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. No hearings. [21-11911] (ECF: Jason Schwartz) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jason C. Schwartz for Appellants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. [21-11911] (ECF: Jason Schwartz) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jason C. Schwartz for Appellants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11911] (ECF: Jason Schwartz) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Alan Richman for Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. [21-11911] (ECF: Brian Richman) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ryan C. Stewart for Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. [21-11911] (ECF: Ryan Stewart) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason C. Schwartz for Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. [21-11911] (ECF: Jason Schwartz) [Entered: 06/11/2021 08:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC. The appellants' brief is due on or before 07/14/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellants' brief. [Entered: 06/09/2021 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 06/09/2021 as to Appellant Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. [Entered: 06/09/2021 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company of Orlando, LLC on 06/04/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/18/2021 as to Appellant Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/02/2021 as to Appellee Elva Benson [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Retail Federation is a litigant

Latest cases where THE RESTAURANT LAW CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS is a litigant

Latest cases where Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC is a litigant