This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/10/2021 at 01:22:04 (UTC).

Eloy Mamani, et al v. Jose Berzain

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Eloy Mamani, filed an Other lawsuit against Jose Berzain. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11545

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

JOSE CARLOS SANCHEZ BERZAIN

GONZALO DANIEL SANCHEZ SANCHEZ BUSTAMANTE

Plaintiff / Appellees

ELOY ROJAS MAMANI

SONIA ESPEJO VILLALOBOS

JUAN PATRICIO QUISPE MAMANI

HERNAN APAZA CUTIPA

ETELVINA RAMOS MAMANI

FELICIDAD ROSA HUANCA QUISPE

JUANA VALENCIA DE CARVAJAL

TEOFILO BALTAZAR CERRO

HERMOGENES BERNABE CALLIZAYA

GONZALO MAMANI AGUILAR

Amicus Curiae

WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen D. Raber

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw Ste 1038

Washington, DC 20005

Giselle Barcia

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw Ste 1038

Washington, DC 20005

Alan M. Dershowitz

Attorney at Harvard Law School

1525 Massachusetts Ave, Griswold Hall 106

Cambridge, MA 02138-2903

Kevin M. Downey

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw Ste 1038

Washington, DC 20005

Jean Ralph Fleurmont

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw Ste 1038

Washington, DC 20005

James E. Gillenwater

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, PA

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4400

Miami, FL 33131

Greg S. Hillson

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw Ste 1038

Washington, DC 20005

Ana Cecilia Reyes

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw Ste 1038

Washington, DC 20005

Suzanne M. Salgado

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw Ste 1038

Washington, DC 20005

Kannon K. Shanmugam

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Anthony DiCaprio

Attorney at Law Office of Anthony DiCaprio

64 Purchase St

Rye, NY 10580

Christine D. Doniak

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

1 Bryant Pk

New York, NY 10036

Tyler Richard Giannini

Attorney at Law Office of Tyler Giannini

6 Everett St

Cambridge, MA 02138

Ilana Gorenstein

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

98 Se 7Th St Ste 1100

Miami, FL 33173

Paul L. Hoffman

Attorney at Schonbrun Seplow Harris & Hoffman, LLP

11543 W Olympic Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Ruben H. Munoz

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 Market St Ste 4100

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7044

David Rudovsky

Attorney at Kairys Rudovsky Messing & Feinberg, LLP

718 Arch St Ste 501 S

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Steven H. Schulman

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Saurabh Sharad

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

2001 Market St Ste 4100

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7044

Joseph Sorkin

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP

1 Bryant Pk

New York, NY 10036

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document #11

Appellant Appendix Filed - Vol. XI of XI

Open Document #9

Appellant Appendix Filed - Vol. IX of XI

Open Document #8

Appellant Appendix Filed - Vol. VIII of XI

Open Document #7

Appellant Appendix Filed - Vol. VII of XI

Open Document #6

Appellant Appendix Filed - Vol. VI of XI

Open Document #5

Appellant Appendix Filed - Vol. V of XI

Open Document #3

Appellant Appendix Filed - Vol. III of XI

Open Document #2

Appellant Appendix Filed - Vol. II of XI

Open Document #1

Appellant Appendix Filed - Vol. I of XI

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #7

DC Order doc 532

Open Document #6

DC Final Judgment doc 533

Open Document #5

NOA doc 536

Open Document #4

DC Order doc 553

Open Document #3

DC Final Judgment doc 554

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. 11 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES (ALL INSIDE 2 BOX) [Entered: 08/03/2021 11:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppendix filed [11 VOLUMES] by Appellants Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. [21-11545] (ECF: Amy Saharia) [Entered: 07/30/2021 11:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to John Mercer Masslon, II for Washington Legal Foundation. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/28/2021 10:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by John M. Masslon II for Washington Legal Foundation. [21-11545] (ECF: John Masslon) [Entered: 07/28/2021 09:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. [Entered: 07/28/2021 11:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by John M. Masslon II for Washington Legal Foundation. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11545] (ECF: John Masslon) [Entered: 07/27/2021 10:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John M. Masslon II for Washington Legal Foundation [21-11545] (ECF: John Masslon) [Entered: 07/27/2021 08:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. [21-11545] (ECF: Amy Saharia) [Entered: 07/26/2021 04:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to consolidate appeals 21-11545 and 21-12264 filed by Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. Motion is Unopposed. [9435558-1] [21-11545] (ECF: Stephen Raber) [Entered: 07/14/2021 05:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexander Gazikas for Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez de Lozada Sanchez Bustamante [21-11545] (ECF: Alexander Gazikas) [Entered: 07/12/2021 08:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stephen D. Raber for Appellants Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11545] (ECF: Stephen Raber) [Entered: 05/18/2021 04:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Stephen D. Raber for Appellants Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [21-11545] (ECF: Stephen Raber) [Entered: 05/18/2021 04:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAppearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Lisa Schiavo Blatt for Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 05/17/2021 01:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James E. Gillenwater for Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. [21-11545] (ECF: James Gillenwater) [Entered: 05/14/2021 05:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael J. Mestitz for Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez de Lozada Sanchez Bustamante [21-11545] (ECF: Michael Mestitz) [Entered: 05/14/2021 03:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amy M. Saharia for Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez de Lozada Sanchez Bustamante [21-11545] (ECF: Amy Saharia) [Entered: 05/14/2021 03:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lisa S. Blatt for Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez de Lozada Sanchez Bustamante [21-11545] (ECF: Lisa Blatt) [Entered: 05/14/2021 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ana Cecilia Reyes for Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. [21-11545] (ECF: Ana Reyes) [Entered: 05/14/2021 03:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen D. Raber for Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain and Gonzalo Daniel Sanchez Sanchez Bustamante. [21-11545] (ECF: Stephen Raber) [Entered: 05/14/2021 03:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain on 05/04/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/14/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/19/2021 as to Appellant Jose Carlos Sanchez Berzain. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/02/2021 as to Appellees [Entered: 05/07/2021 10:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ilana Gorenstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven H Schulman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID RUDOVSKY