This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/08/2022 at 06:14:17 (UTC).

Elliott v. Cartagena

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Elliott filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cartagena. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-255

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

Marcello Valenzano, AKA Cool

Andre Lyon, AKA Dre

Dade Co. Project Music, Inc.

Po Folks Music

Joseph Anthony Cartagena, AKA Fat Joe

Karim Kharbouch, AKA French Montana

Shandel Green, AKA Infared

New York, NY 10019

Reminisce Smith Mackie, AKA Remy Ma

Edward F. Davadi, Jr., AKA Edsclusive

Joey and Ryan Music

Excuse My French Music

Excuse My French Music II

Mr. Green Music

New York, NY 10019

Remynisce Music

Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, DBA Universal Music Z Songs

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.

Songs of Universal Inc.

Roc Nation LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

Eric A. Elliott, AKA Fly Havana

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Alfred Joseph Fluehr Esq.

Attorney at Francis Alexander, LLC

280 North Providence Road, Suite 1

Media, PA 19063

Francis Malofiy Esq.

280 North Providence Road, Suite 1

Media, PA 19063

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eleanor M. Lackman Esq.

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

437 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Dariush G. Adli

Attorney at ADLI Law Group P.C.

12400 Wilshire Bpulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Shandel Green

1745 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Hillel Ira Parness Esq.

Attorney at Parness Law Firm, PLLC

136 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Mr. Green Music

1745 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Ilene Susan Farkas Esq.

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Other Attorneys

Tamar Y. Duvdevani Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ORDER, dated 04/06/2022, setting 06/21/2022 as Appellant Eric A. Elliot's brief due date, FILED.[3292456] [22-255] [Entered: 04/06/2022 02:45 PM]

#44

(#44) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, informing Court of proposed due date 06/20/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 04/05/2022 by CM/ECF.[3291797] [22-255] [Entered: 04/05/2022 06:03 PM]

#42

(#42) NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3285389] [22-255] [Entered: 03/25/2022 04:17 PM]

#37

(#37) CAPTION, Marcello Valenzano, Andre Lyon, Dade Co. Project Music, Inc. and Po Folks Music's designation were changed to Defendants, AMENDED.[3282912] [22-255] [Entered: 03/23/2022 09:09 AM]

#35

(#35) NOTICE, to Appellee Mr. Green Music, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[3282905] [22-255] [Entered: 03/23/2022 09:06 AM]

#34

(#34) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3282895] [22-255] [Entered: 03/23/2022 08:58 AM]

#31

(#31) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, FILED. Service date 03/22/2022 by CM/ECF.[3282073] [22-255] [Entered: 03/22/2022 10:19 AM]

#30

(#30) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, FILED. Service date 03/22/2022 by CM/ECF.[3282072] [22-255] [Entered: 03/22/2022 10:19 AM]

#27

(#32) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, FILED.[3282156] [22-255] [Entered: 03/22/2022 10:57 AM]

#8

(#8) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/30/2021, RECEIVED.[3257903] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:51 AM]

#7

(#7) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/05/2021, RECEIVED.[3257898] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:48 AM]

#6

(#6) DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 01/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3257897] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:48 AM]

#5

(#5) DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 12/14/2020, RECEIVED.[3257894] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:46 AM]

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 09/14/2020, RECEIVED.[3257893] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:46 AM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 08/28/2020, RECEIVED.[3257891] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:45 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 07/31/2020, RECEIVED.[3257889] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:44 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER, dated 04/06/2022, setting 06/21/2022 as Appellant Eric A. Elliot's brief due date, FILED.[3292456] [22-255] [Entered: 04/06/2022 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, informing Court of proposed due date 06/20/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 04/05/2022 by CM/ECF.[3291797] [22-255] [Entered: 04/05/2022 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3285389] [22-255] [Entered: 03/25/2022 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) CAPTION, Marcello Valenzano, Andre Lyon, Dade Co. Project Music, Inc. and Po Folks Music's designation were changed to Defendants, AMENDED.[3282912] [22-255] [Entered: 03/23/2022 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE, to Appellee Mr. Green Music, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[3282905] [22-255] [Entered: 03/23/2022 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3282895] [22-255] [Entered: 03/23/2022 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, FILED.[3282156] [22-255] [Entered: 03/22/2022 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, FILED. Service date 03/22/2022 by CM/ECF.[3282073] [22-255] [Entered: 03/22/2022 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, FILED. Service date 03/22/2022 by CM/ECF.[3282072] [22-255] [Entered: 03/22/2022 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, FILED. Service date 03/22/2022 by CM/ECF.[3282062] [22-255] [Entered: 03/22/2022 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/06/2022, RECEIVED.[3257905] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 01/05/2022, RECEIVED.[3257904] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/30/2021, RECEIVED.[3257903] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/05/2021, RECEIVED.[3257898] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 01/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3257897] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 12/14/2020, RECEIVED.[3257894] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 09/14/2020, RECEIVED.[3257893] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 08/28/2020, RECEIVED.[3257891] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 07/31/2020, RECEIVED.[3257889] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Eric A. Elliott, FILED. [3257887] [22-255] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROC NATION, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. is a litigant