This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/05/2020 at 06:07:24 (UTC).

Elizabeth Fuentes, et al v. Maxim Healthcare Services Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Elizabeth Fuentes filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Maxim Healthcare Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55497

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ELIZABETH FUENTES

MYRNA JOHNSTON, individually, and on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellee

MAXIM HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC., a Maryland corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tom D. Rutledge

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas D. Rutledge

113 West G Street, Suite 231

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John S. Battenfeld Esquire

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Brian Fahy

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Lincoln Owens Bisbee

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Karen Cho

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed order MEDIATION (SMC): A dial-in telephone conference will be held on September 9, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. Please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov if counsel does not receive an email or if additional participants should be added. The time schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: transcript shall be ordered on or before August 31, 2020; transcript shall be filed by the court reporter on or before September 30, 2020; appellants shall file an opening brief on or before November 9, 2020; appellee shall file an answering brief on or before December 9, 2020; appellant may file an optional reply brief within twenty one (21) days from the service date of the answering brief. [11721890] (AF) [Entered: 06/15/2020 01:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket(#6) Terminated attorney Brian Fahy for appellee Maxim Healthcare Services Inc. in 20-55497. [11690159] (HH) [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Brian Fahy for Appellee Maxim Healthcare Services Inc.. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 05/13/2020. [11690157] [20-55497] (Fahy, Brian) [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/11/2020, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11690003] (BLS) [Entered: 05/13/2020 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/11/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11687320]. [20-55497] (AD) [Entered: 05/11/2020 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Elizabeth Fuentes and Myrna Johnston Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/11/2020. [11686507] [20-55497] (Rutledge, Tom) [Entered: 05/11/2020 12:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Elizabeth Fuentes and Myrna Johnston Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/13/2020. Transcript ordered by 06/02/2020. Transcript due 07/02/2020. Appellants Elizabeth Fuentes and Myrna Johnston opening brief due 08/11/2020. Appellee Maxim Healthcare Services Inc. answering brief due 09/10/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11682188] (JBS) [Entered: 05/06/2020 10:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less