This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:15 (UTC).

Elizabeth Coomes v. Thomas Gorman

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Elizabeth Coomes filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Thomas Gorman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1740

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Debtors

ELIZABETH HARING COOMES, d/b/a Old Town Insurance & Financial

214 Lippincott Avenue

Ardmore, PA 19003

In re: ELIZABETH HARING COOMES

Trustee

THOMAS PATRICK GORMAN, Chapter 13 Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Elizabeth Haring Coomes

214 Lippincott Avenue

Ardmore, PA 19003

Trustee Attorney

Marcelo Ramiro Michel

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE

300 North Washington Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) MOTION by Elizabeth Haring Coomes to refund fees paid to Court of Appeals. Date and method of service: 09/09/2019 ecf. [1000584174] [19-1740] Elizabeth Coomes [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:41 PM]

47 #2

Additional Document

47 #1

Letter

#46

(#46) ORDER filed [1000583276] granting motion to deem response timely filed [ # 45 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:05 AM]

#45

(#45) MOTION by Elizabeth Haring Coomes to Motion to Deem Response Timely Filed Or In The Alternative Extend Time.. Date and method of service: 09/06/2019 ecf. [1000583066] [19-1740] Elizabeth Coomes [Entered: 09/06/2019 04:18 PM]

#44

(#44) ORDER filed [1000582933] suspending briefing schedule. Copies to all parties. [19-1740] AB [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:02 PM]

#43

(#43) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Elizabeth Haring Coomes to Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 11 ], Motion to consolidate case [ # 11 ]. [19-1740]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by EB- docket text modified.] Elizabeth Coomes [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:00 AM]

42 #1

MOTION

#11

(#39) ORDER filed [1000576527] denying Motion to consolidate case [ # 11 ]; deferring action on Motion to supplement filed by Appellant Elizabeth Haring Coomes [ # 35 ]; deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Elizabeth Haring Coomes [22], [20], [19]; deferring action on Motion to suspend filed by Appellant Elizabeth Haring Coomes [ # 18 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 08/28/2019 03:54 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Elizabeth Haring Coomes. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000549789] [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:08 AM]

#6

(#6) MOTION by Elizabeth Haring Coomes for leave to file electronically. [1000549765] [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:00 AM]

#9

(#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Elizabeth Haring Coomes. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:28 PM]

#4

(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/30/2019. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:52 AM]

3 #2

Disclosure Form

3 #1

Informal Briefing Order

#2

Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis

2 #1

Fee Notice

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01322-TSE-MSN, 17-13497-BFK. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:42 AM]

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) MOTION by Elizabeth Haring Coomes to refund fees paid to Court of Appeals. Date and method of service: 09/09/2019 ecf. [1000584174] [19-1740] Elizabeth Coomes [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Letter re: [ # 2 ] initial notice by Elizabeth Haring Coomes . [1000583856] [19-1740] Elizabeth Coomes [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER filed [1000583276] granting motion to deem response timely filed [ # 45 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MOTION by Elizabeth Haring Coomes to Motion to Deem Response Timely Filed Or In The Alternative Extend Time.. Date and method of service: 09/06/2019 ecf. [1000583066] [19-1740] Elizabeth Coomes [Entered: 09/06/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER filed [1000582933] suspending briefing schedule. Copies to all parties. [19-1740] AB [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Elizabeth Haring Coomes to Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 11 ], Motion to consolidate case [ # 11 ]. [19-1740]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by EB- docket text modified.] Elizabeth Coomes [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Emergency MOTION by Elizabeth Haring Coomes to extend filing time for response/reply brief until September 30, 2019 for motions to reconsider and October 21, 2019 for response to response to Trustee's motion to dismiss or consolidate... Date and method of service: 09/04/2019 ecf. [1000581359] [19-1740] Elizabeth Coomes [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Notice issued re: [ # 40 ] Objections and Exceptions. [19-1740] DL [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE re: Objections and Exceptions to Orders entered August 15, 2019 and August 28, 2019 by Elizabeth Haring Coomes. [19-1740] Elizabeth Coomes [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER filed [1000576527] denying Motion to consolidate case [ # 11 ]; deferring action on Motion to supplement filed by Appellant Elizabeth Haring Coomes [ # 35 ]; deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Elizabeth Haring Coomes [22], [20], [19]; deferring action on Motion to suspend filed by Appellant Elizabeth Haring Coomes [ # 18 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 08/28/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE re: transcript order forms by Elizabeth Haring Coomes. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice issued re: motion for leave to file electronically deemed moot. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Elizabeth Haring Coomes. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000549789] [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Elizabeth Haring Coomes for leave to file electronically. [1000549765] [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Elizabeth Haring Coomes. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01322-TSE-MSN, 17-13497-BFK. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/17/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/30/2019. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FEE NOTICE issued to Elizabeth Haring Coomes - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 07/31/2019. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01322-TSE-MSN,17-13497-BFK. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01322-TSE-MSN, 17-13497-BFK. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-1740] EB [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.