This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/20/2021 at 06:03:02 (UTC).

Elizabeth Adam v. AQ Textiles LLC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Elizabeth Adam filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against AQ Textiles LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2033

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ELIZABETH ADAM, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated

REBECCA FOLEY, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

AQ TEXTILES LLC

CREATIVE TEXTILE MILLS PVT. LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Charles E. Schaffer

501 Walnut Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Scott Crissman Harris

Attorney at MILBERG COLEMAN BRYSON PHILLIPS GROSSMAN, PLLC

900 West Morgan Street

Raleigh, NC 27603

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ryan Clifford Fairchild

115 North 3Rd Street

Wilmington, NC 28401

Andrew Leigh Rodenbough

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE, LLP

P. O. Box 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420

Jennifer K. Van Zant

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE, LLP

P. O. Box 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420

Kasi Wahlers Robinson

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE, LLP

P. O. Box 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kasi Wahlers Robinson for AQ Textiles LLC. [1001029353] [21-2033] Kasi Robinson [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:17 AM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AQ Textiles LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001029357] [21-2033] Kasi Robinson [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:19 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer K. Van Zant for AQ Textiles LLC. [1001029366] [21-2033] Jennifer Van Zant [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:30 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew L. Rodenbough for AQ Textiles LLC. [1001029367] [21-2033] Andrew Rodenbough [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:31 AM]

#8

(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Elizabeth Adam and Rebecca Foley. [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:15 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott C. Harris for Elizabeth Adam and Rebecca Foley. [1001036080] [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:19 PM]

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elizabeth Adam. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001036092] [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:27 PM]

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rebecca Foley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001036094] [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:28 PM]

#12

(#12) MOTION by Elizabeth Adam and Rebecca Foley to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until January 7, 2022.. Date and method of service: 10/06/2021 ecf. [1001036659] [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/06/2021 12:54 PM]

#13

(#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [21-2033] LHP [Entered: 10/06/2021 01:22 PM]

#14

(#14) CORRECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by AQ Textiles LLC. [21-2033] Kasi Robinson [Entered: 10/06/2021 01:45 PM]

#15

(#15) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 12/01/2021. Response brief due 01/03/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001036863] [21-2033] RJL [Entered: 10/06/2021 03:10 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 12/01/2021. Response brief due 01/03/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001036863] [21-2033] RJL [Entered: 10/06/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORRECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by AQ Textiles LLC. [21-2033] Kasi Robinson [Entered: 10/06/2021 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [21-2033] LHP [Entered: 10/06/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Elizabeth Adam and Rebecca Foley to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until January 7, 2022.. Date and method of service: 10/06/2021 ecf. [1001036659] [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/06/2021 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rebecca Foley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001036094] [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elizabeth Adam. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001036092] [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott C. Harris for Elizabeth Adam and Rebecca Foley. [1001036080] [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Elizabeth Adam and Rebecca Foley. [21-2033] Scott Harris [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew L. Rodenbough for AQ Textiles LLC. [1001029367] [21-2033] Andrew Rodenbough [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer K. Van Zant for AQ Textiles LLC. [1001029366] [21-2033] Jennifer Van Zant [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AQ Textiles LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001029357] [21-2033] Kasi Robinson [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kasi Wahlers Robinson for AQ Textiles LLC. [1001029353] [21-2033] Kasi Robinson [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Charles Schaffer. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/01/2021. Response Brief due 12/01/2021. [21-2033] RJL [Entered: 09/21/2021 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00520-LCB-JLW. Mailed to: Charles Schaffer. [21-2033] RJL [Entered: 09/21/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00520-LCB-JLW. Case manager: RachelLee. [21-2033] RJL [Entered: 09/21/2021 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AQ Textiles, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew L Rodenbaugh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer K Van Zant