This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:07:30 (UTC).

Eliseo Hernandez-Rios v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Eliseo Hernandez-Rios filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70375

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELISEO HERNANDEZ-RIOS

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Christopher John Stender Esquire

Attorney at Federal Immigration Counselors, AZ, PC

141 East Palm Lane

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Respondent Attorneys

Elizabeth Robyn Chapman

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Petition for Review

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

BIA Decision

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Elizabeth Robyn Chapman for party(s) Respondent William P. Barr, in case 20-70375. [11596566] (QDL) [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Elizabeth R. Chapman (USDOJ-OIL, PO Box 878 Ben Franklin Station, Washington DC 20044) for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 02/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11596477] [20-70375] (Chapman, Elizabeth) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595707]. [20-70375] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review. COUNSELED. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Eliseo Hernandez-Rios. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11594704] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.