This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2019 at 06:08:03 (UTC).

Elias Sanchez Gallego v. Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Elias Sanchez Gallego filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-341

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Miguel Elias Sanchez Gallego, individually, and on behalf of others similarly situated

Raymundo Vazquez Angel, individually, and on behalf of others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellants

Anitha Gounder

Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp., DBA Adyar Ananda Bhavan

Suthan Gounder

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Joshua S. Androphy Esq.

Attorney at Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.

60 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10165

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Brian L. Greben Esq.

Attorney at Brian L. Greben, Esq.

316 Great Neck Road

Great Neck, NY 11021

 

Court Documents

#22

No Description Available

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/10/2019, RECEIVED.[2492920] [19-341] [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:33 PM]

#21

No Description Available

#26

(#26) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Raymundo Vazquez Angel and Miguel Elias Sanchez Gallego, FILED. Service date 03/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2513974] [19-341] [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:25 PM]

#35

(#35) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/18/2019, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2520114] [19-341] [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:08 PM]

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#28

(#28) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, [27], on behalf of Appellant Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp., Anitha Gounder and Suthan Gounder, FILED.[2518879] [19-341] [Entered: 03/15/2019 12:17 PM]

#9

(#9) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/30/2018, RECEIVED.[2493929] [19-341] [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:17 PM]

#30

(#30) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2519883] [19-341] [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:46 PM]

#34

(#34) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[2520102] [19-341] [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:04 PM]

#24

(#24) NOTICE, to Appellee Raymundo Vazquez Angel and Miguel Elias Sanchez Gallego, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2513502] [19-341] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:04 AM]

#15

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2492918] [19-341] [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:32 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

10 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/18/2019, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2520114] [19-341] [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[2520102] [19-341] [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CURED DEFECTIVE FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellant Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp., Anitha Gounder and Suthan Gounder, FILED.[2519915] [19-341] [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2519883] [19-341] [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, [27], on behalf of Appellant Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp., Anitha Gounder and Suthan Gounder, FILED.[2518879] [19-341] [Entered: 03/15/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • (#27) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 03/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2518869] [19-341] [Entered: 03/15/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Raymundo Vazquez Angel and Miguel Elias Sanchez Gallego, FILED. Service date 03/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2513974] [19-341] [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Anitha Gounder and Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp., FILED. Service date 03/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2513810] [19-341] [Entered: 03/08/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE, to Appellee Raymundo Vazquez Angel and Miguel Elias Sanchez Gallego, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2513502] [19-341] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/05/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2508763] [19-341] [Entered: 03/01/2019 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp. and Anitha Gounder, FILED. Service date 02/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2501198] [19-341] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp. and Anitha Gounder, FILED. Service date 02/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2501196] [19-341] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2495500] [19-341] [Entered: 02/13/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/30/2018, RECEIVED.[2493929] [19-341] [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp., Anitha Gounder and Suthan Gounder, FILED.[2493928] [19-341] [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • (#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp., Anitha Gounder and Suthan Gounder, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16306004, FILED.[2492927] [19-341] [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2492922] [19-341] [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/10/2019, RECEIVED.[2492920] [19-341] [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2492918] [19-341] [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Adyar Ananda Bhavan Corp., Anitha Gounder and Suthan Gounder, FILED. [2492911] [19-341] [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.