This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/26/2019 at 06:06:45 (UTC).

Electronic Communication v. Minted, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Electronic Communication filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Minted, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1586

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

MINTED, LLC

SHOPPERSCHOICE.COM, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jason P. Dollard

Attorney at Law Offices of Jason P. Dollard P.A.

127 Ne 2Nd Avenue

Delray Beach, FL 33444

Artoush Ohanian Esq. I

Attorney at OhanianIP

604 West 13Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ricardo Bonilla

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Theresa Dawson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

James Stepan

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

350 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1750

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

David K. Friedland

Attorney at Friedland Vining, PA

9100 S Dadeland Boulevard, Suite 1620

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time

16 #1

Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION of Appellant Electronic Communication Technologies, LLC to extend the time to 05/10/2019 to file the Appellant Brief due 4/26/2019. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603010] [19-1586] [Artoush Ohanian] [Entered: 04/25/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Minted, LLC. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [591936] [19-1586] [Ricardo Bonilla] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Entry of appearance for James A. Stepan as of counsel for Appellee ShoppersChoice.com, LLC. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [591935] [19-1586] [James Stepan] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Minted, LLC. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [591934] [19-1586] [Ricardo Bonilla] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Entry of appearance for Ricardo J. Bonilla as principal counsel for Appellee Minted, LLC. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [591931] [19-1586] [Ricardo Bonilla] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Theresa M. Dawson as of counsel for Appellee Minted, LLC. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [591925] [19-1586] [Theresa Dawson] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Neil J. McNabnay as of counsel for Appellee Minted, LLC. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [591921] [19-1586] [Neil McNabnay] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee ShoppersChoice.com, LLC. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [591916] [19-1586] [David Friedland] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee ShoppersChoice.com, LLC. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [591915] [19-1586] [David Friedland] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for David K. Friedland as principal counsel for Appellee ShoppersChoice.com, LLC. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [591914] [19-1586] [David Friedland] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Electronic Communication Technologies, LLC. Service: 03/08/2019 by email. [591671] [19-1586] [Artoush Ohanian] [Entered: 03/08/2019 07:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Electronic Communication Technologies, LLC. Service: 03/08/2019 by email. [591670] [19-1586] [Artoush Ohanian] [Entered: 03/08/2019 07:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for H. Artoush Ohanian of OhanianIP as principal counsel for Appellant Electronic Communication Technologies, LLC. Service: 03/08/2019 by email. [591669] [19-1586] [Artoush Ohanian] [Entered: 03/08/2019 07:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • (#3) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 19-1586 (Lead) with 19-1587 (Member Case). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [589949] [19-1586, 19-1587] [TAM] [Entered: 03/04/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER consolidating appeals (19-1586 with 19-1587). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [589947] [19-1586, 19-1587] [TAM] [Entered: 03/04/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/19/2019. [588416] Entry of Appearance due 03/11/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/11/2019. Docketing Statement due 03/11/2019. Appellant's brief is due 04/26/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shopperschoice.com, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Minted, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Electronic Communication Technologies, LLC is a litigant