This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/17/2022 at 06:36:57 (UTC).

Eisenbach v. Village of Nelsonville

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 Eisenbach filed an Other lawsuit against Village of Nelsonville. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2963

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

David Eisenbach

George H. Eisenbach

Joanne Eisenbach

Dana Carini

Rosemarie Orshakoski

Jennifer Young

Jonathan D. Champlin

Anne Champlin

Michael Orshakoski

Kenneth Levine

Catherine Polera

Raymond H. Champlin

Hope Rogers

Phil Weiss

Julien Davies

Jo Mango

Lauralee Holmbo

Cynthia King

Defendant / Appellees

Village of Nelsonville

Village of Nelsonville Zoning Board of Appeals

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Vincent Caruso Esq.

Attorney at Michael V. Caruso, P.C.

3871 Danbury Road

Brewster, NY 10509

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jonathan Michael Bardavid Esq.

Attorney at Daniels, Porco and Lusardi, LLP

102 Gleneida Avenue

Carmel, NY 10512

Other Attorneys

Robert D. Gaudioso Esq.

Attorney at Snyder & Snyder, LLP

94 White Plains Road

Tarrytown, NY 10591

Andrew Bradford Joseph Esq.

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Carlotta Cassidy Esq.

Attorney at Snyder & Snyder, LLP

94 White Plains Road

Tarrytown, NY 10591

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 01/21/2022, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3264641] [21-2963] [Entered: 02/22/2022 08:53 AM]

#34

(#34) NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[3256421] [21-2963] [Entered: 02/07/2022 10:04 AM]

#30

(#30) ORDER, dated 01/21/2022, dismissing appeal effective 02/04/2022 unless Appellants' file brief. Appellees responsive brief is due 35 days after the filing of Appellants opening brief. Any reply brief is due 14 days thereafter, FILED.[3247888] [21-2963] [Entered: 01/21/2022 03:03 PM]

#27

(#27) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/18/2022, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3239852] [21-2963] [Entered: 01/07/2022 01:33 PM]

#25

(#25) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 01/20/2022, appellees' brief due date as 02/24/2022,TRANSMITTED.[3229083] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:20 AM]

#24

(#24) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC, FILED. Service date 12/15/2021 by CM/ECF.[3228926] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/15/2021 04:03 PM]

#22

(#22) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/11/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3228826] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/15/2021 02:41 PM]

#16

(#16) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young, FILED. Service date 12/14/2021 by CM/ECF.[3228417] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:17 PM]

#15

(#15) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young, FILED. Service date 12/14/2021 by CM/ECF.[3228416] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:14 PM]

#13

No Description Available

#12

(#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearane, [11], on behalf of Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young, FILED.[3226769] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/13/2021 09:29 AM]

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee William Bujarski, Village of Nelsonville, Village of Nelsonville Planning Board and Village of Nelsonville Zoning Board of Appeals, FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3225533] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/09/2021 10:27 AM]

#8

(#9) ATTORNEY, Carlotta Cassidy for New York SMSA Limited Partnership Homeland Towers, LLC, in case 21-2963, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[3224768] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:23 AM]

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Homeland Towers, LLC and New York SMSA Limited Partnership, FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224746] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:06 AM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3221227] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/02/2021 09:18 AM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 01/21/2022, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3264641] [21-2963] [Entered: 02/22/2022 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER, [ # 30 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young failure to file brief and appendix, EFFECTIVE.[3256427] [21-2963] [Entered: 02/07/2022 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[3256421] [21-2963] [Entered: 02/07/2022 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER, dated 01/21/2022, dismissing appeal effective 02/04/2022 unless Appellants' file brief. Appellees responsive brief is due 35 days after the filing of Appellants opening brief. Any reply brief is due 14 days thereafter, FILED.[3247888] [21-2963] [Entered: 01/21/2022 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/18/2022, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3239852] [21-2963] [Entered: 01/07/2022 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 01/20/2022, appellees' brief due date as 02/24/2022,TRANSMITTED.[3229083] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC, FILED. Service date 12/15/2021 by CM/ECF.[3228926] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/15/2021 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/11/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3228826] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/15/2021 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young, FILED. Service date 12/14/2021 by CM/ECF.[3228417] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young, FILED. Service date 12/14/2021 by CM/ECF.[3228416] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearane, [11], on behalf of Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young, FILED.[3226769] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/13/2021 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young, FILED. Service date 12/13/2021 by CM/ECF.[3226759] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/13/2021 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee William Bujarski, Village of Nelsonville, Village of Nelsonville Planning Board and Village of Nelsonville Zoning Board of Appeals, FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3225533] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/09/2021 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY, Carlotta Cassidy for New York SMSA Limited Partnership Homeland Towers, LLC, in case 21-2963, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[3224768] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Homeland Towers, LLC and New York SMSA Limited Partnership, FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3224752] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Homeland Towers, LLC and New York SMSA Limited Partnership, FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224746] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3221231] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/02/2021 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young, district court receipt # ANYSDC-25408427, FILED.[3221229] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/02/2021 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3221227] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/02/2021 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Dana Carini, Anne Champlin, Jonathan D. Champlin, Raymond H. Champlin, Julien Davies, David Eisenbach, George H. Eisenbach, Joanne Eisenbach, Lauralee Holmbo, Cynthia King, Kenneth Levine, Jo Mango, Michael Orshakoski, Rosemarie Orshakoski, Catherine Polera, Hope Rogers, Phil Weiss and Jennifer Young, FILED. [3221225] [21-2963] [Entered: 12/02/2021 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlotta Cassidy Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert D. Gaudioso

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Bradford Joseph