This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2019 at 06:00:24 (UTC).

EEOC v. Bart V. Investment, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 EEOC filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bart. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20398

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

BART V. INVESTMENT, INCORPORATED, doing business as Original Connie's Seafood Number 1

Plaintiff / Appellee

EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

William S. Helfand

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

24 Greenway Plaza, Weslayan Tower

Houston, TX 77046

Joshua Redelman

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

24 Greenway Plaza, Weslayan Tower

Houston, TX 77046

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Lloyd Stefanus van Oostenrijk Esq.

Attorney at U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

1919 Smith Street

Houston, TX 77002

James Mark Tucker

Attorney at U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

131 M Street, N.E.

Washington, DC 20507

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William S. Helfand for Bart V. Investment, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20398] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 06/12/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9070206-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/24/2019 for Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated [19-20398] (DMS) [Entered: 06/07/2019 08:27 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20398] (James Mark Tucker ) [Entered: 06/07/2019 07:11 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/09/2019 for Appellants Big Catch Corporation, Bart V. Investment, Incorporated and Connie Seafood, Incorporated. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (JMW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:25 PM]

Open Document #2

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

REPLY filed [9088442-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellee EEOC in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [ # 9084357-2 ], to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [ # 9079879-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/01/2019. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: REPLY filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation in 19-20395, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399 [9088442-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellee EEOC in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [ # 9084357-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Helfand, Redelman; Attorney for Appellees: Tucker, van Oostenrijk. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:49 PM]

Open Document

NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Fred E. Warner in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 06/13/2019. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 07/15/2019 for Fred E. Warner, Court Reporter [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (JMW) [Entered: 07/01/2019 08:03 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9084357-1] [ # 9080548-2 ], Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [ # 9079879-2 ]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 06/26/2019. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by EEOC in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [9084357-1] to the Motion filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation in 19-20395, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399 [ # 9079879-2 ], Court Order [ # 9080548-2 ] Date of Service: 06/26/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Helfand, Redelman; Attorney for Appellees: Tucker, van Oostenrijk. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (James Mark Tucker ) [Entered: 06/26/2019 09:38 AM]

Open Document #2

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

OPPOSED MOTION for stay pending appeal [9079879-2] Ruling is requested by: 06/21/2019. Date of service: 06/19/2019 [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation in 19-20395, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399 to stay district court proceedings [9079879-2] Ruling is requested by: 06/21/2019. Date of service: 06/19/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Helfand, Redelman; Attorney for Appellees: Tucker, van Oostenrijk [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 06/19/2019 04:34 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation in 19-20395, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399for the Court to process. Date of service: 06/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Helfand, Redelman; Attorney for Appellees: Tucker, van Oostenrijk. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:17 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting unopposed motion to consolidate cases 19-20395, 19-20398, and 19-20399, for briefing and oral argument purposes, filed by Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated [ # 9074618-2 ] in 19-20399. [19-20399, 19-20395, 19-20398] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:27 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated [19-20398] (AS) [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:29 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/09/2019 for Appellants Big Catch Corporation, Bart V. Investment, Incorporated and Connie Seafood, Incorporated. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (JMW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20398] (LLL) [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:19-MC-1053; 4:19-MC-1050; 4:19-MC-1037. Electronic ROA due on 08/12/2019. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (JMW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 07/01/2019 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (JMW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER granting opposed motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated [ # 9079879-2 ] [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (JMW) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY filed [9088442-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellee EEOC in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [ # 9084357-2 ], to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [ # 9079879-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/01/2019. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: REPLY filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation in 19-20395, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399 [9088442-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellee EEOC in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [ # 9084357-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Helfand, Redelman; Attorney for Appellees: Tucker, van Oostenrijk. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Fred E. Warner in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 06/13/2019. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 07/15/2019 for Fred E. Warner, Court Reporter [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (JMW) [Entered: 07/01/2019 08:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9084357-1] [ # 9080548-2 ], Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [ # 9079879-2 ]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 06/26/2019. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by EEOC in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [9084357-1] to the Motion filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation in 19-20395, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399 [ # 9079879-2 ], Court Order [ # 9080548-2 ] Date of Service: 06/26/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Helfand, Redelman; Attorney for Appellees: Tucker, van Oostenrijk. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (James Mark Tucker ) [Entered: 06/26/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER TEMPORARILY GRANTING Opposed Motion for stay pending appeal pending further order of the court filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated [ # 9079879-2 ]; requesting a response to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399 [ # 9079879-2 ] Response/Opposition due on 06/26/2019 [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (ABT) [Entered: 06/20/2019 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSED MOTION for stay pending appeal [9079879-2] Ruling is requested by: 06/21/2019. Date of service: 06/19/2019 [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation in 19-20395, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399 to stay district court proceedings [9079879-2] Ruling is requested by: 06/21/2019. Date of service: 06/19/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Helfand, Redelman; Attorney for Appellees: Tucker, van Oostenrijk [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 06/19/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William S. Helfand for Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399 [19-20399] (CAG) [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William S. Helfand for Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398 [19-20398, 19-20395, 19-20399] (DMS) [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Big Catch Corporation in 19-20395, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Proceeding Type and Date: Show Ca;use Hearing 05/24/2019. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 06/24/2019 for Fred Warner, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9075187-2 ] [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (JMW) [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Big Catch Corporation in 19-20395, Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated in 19-20398, Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated in 19-20399for the Court to process. Date of service: 06/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Helfand, Redelman; Attorney for Appellees: Tucker, van Oostenrijk. [19-20395, 19-20398, 19-20399] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting unopposed motion to consolidate cases 19-20395, 19-20398, and 19-20399, for briefing and oral argument purposes, filed by Appellant Connie Seafood, Incorporated [ # 9074618-2 ] in 19-20399. [19-20399, 19-20395, 19-20398] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William S. Helfand for Bart V. Investment, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20398] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 06/12/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) James Mark Tucker for party(s) Appellee EEOC, in case 19-20398 [19-20398] (JMW) [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9070206-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/24/2019 for Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated [19-20398] (DMS) [Entered: 06/07/2019 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20398] (James Mark Tucker ) [Entered: 06/07/2019 07:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Bart V. Investment, Incorporated [19-20398] (AS) [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less