This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/09/2020 at 06:08:54 (UTC).

Edyta Gryglak v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A., et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Edyta Gryglak filed an Other lawsuit against HSBC Bank USA, N A ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15037

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

EDYTA GRYGLAK, FKA Edyta A. Fromkin

Defendant / Appellees

WELLS FARGO ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

HSBC BANK USA, N.A., as trustee for Wells Fargo Home Equity Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-3, by its Attorney-in-fact Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Boris Avramski Esquire

Edward Griffith Esquire

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nathan Kanute

Kelly Harrison Dove Esquire

Blakeley E. Griffith Esquire

Jennifer Lustig McBee Esquire

Amy F. Sorenson

Gil Kahn

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SL): The conference previously scheduled for February 24, 2020, is canceled. Appellants unopposed motion to dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 9 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11607174] (AF) [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellant Edyta Gryglak Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 02/21/2020. [11605527] [20-15037] (Griffith, Edward) [Entered: 02/21/2020 06:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Gil Kahn for party(s) Appellee Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A., in case 20-15037. [11595357] (JFF) [Entered: 02/12/2020 03:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gil Kahn (Snell & Wilmer L.L.P., 3883 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 1100, Las Vegas, Nevada 89169-5958) for Appellees HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 02/12/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11595332] [20-15037] (Kahn, Gil) [Entered: 02/12/2020 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 02/24/2020, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 02/13/2020 ). [11582341] (VS) [Entered: 02/03/2020 10:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): On July 11, 2019, the district court denied appellants motion for a preliminary injunction. Appellant has appealed that denial in appeal No. 19- 16517. This court granted appellants request for an injunction during the pendency of appeal No. 19-16517 and remanded for the limited purpose of determining whether appellant should be required to post bond, and if so, in what amount. On November 14, 2019, the district court ordered appellant to post bond in the amount of $159,129.04. Appellant sought reconsideration of the bond order, but posted the required bond on December 5, 2019, prior to the district courts ruling on the reconsideration motion. On January 7, 2020, appellant filed this appeal, challenging the district courts November 14, 2019 bond order. A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over the appeal because the challenged order may not be final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291. In addition, the appeal may also be moot. Appellant did not request a stay of the challenged order from this court and has already posted the required bond. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of this appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If electing to show cause, appellant shall also address any effect that a decision in appeal No. 19-16517 would have on this appeal and may request any other appropriate relief. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11581271] (HC) [Entered: 01/31/2020 02:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 02/13/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11581141] (VS) [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/24/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11573622]. [20-15037] (AD) [Entered: 01/24/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Edyta Gryglak Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/24/2020. [11573054] [20-15037] (Griffith, Edward) [Entered: 01/24/2020 09:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Edyta Gryglak Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/16/2020. Appellant Edyta Gryglak opening brief due 03/09/2020. Appellees HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answering brief due 04/08/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11555909] (JBS) [Entered: 01/09/2020 09:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less