This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 06:02:37 (UTC).

Edwin Algarin-Moure v. Comvaltech Corp of Puerto Rico

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Edwin Algarin-Moure filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Comvaltech Corp of Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2262

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

FIRST BANK OF PUERTO RICO

GENERAL ATTORNEY OF THE UNITED STATE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

PFIZER GLOBAL MANUFACTURING PUERTO RICO

SCOTIA BANK OF PUERTO RICO

WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY INC.

LILLY DEL CARIBE INC.

PFIZER INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION PUERTO RICO

WYETH-WHITEHALL PARMACEUTICALS INC.

PFIZER GLOBAL MANUFACTURING

LIQUID CAPTIAL EXCHANGE INC.

PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

COMVALTECH CORP. OF PUERTO RICO

PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

HECTOR RAFAEL FIGUEROA FERNANDEZ

GARRINGTON GROUP LTD

WYETH-WHITEHALL PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

EDWIN A. ALGARIN-MOURE

Alexandria, VA 22311

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Craig Crandall Reilly

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CRAIG C. REILLY

209 Madison Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

Peter John Komorowski III

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING, LLP

850 10Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Theresa Allyn Queen

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

1750 Tysons Boulevard

Mclean, VA 22102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Edwin A. Algarin-Moure

5422 Bradford Court

Alexandria, VA 22311

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

RESTRICTED

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#10

9 #3

Document 3

9 #2

Document 2

9 #1

Document 1

#8

7 #3

exhibit 2

7 #2

exhibit 1

7 #1

MOTION

#3

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Redacted version posted for Motion to appoint/assign counsel. Reason not available through remote electronic access:personal data identifiers. [20-2262] DL [Entered: 01/05/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure to appoint/assign counsel. Date and method of service: 01/05/2021 US mail. [1000875764] [20-2262] DL [Entered: 01/05/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Garrington Group LTD, Lilly Del Caribe Inc., Liquid Captial Exchange Inc., Pfizer Global Manufacturing, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Company Inc. and Wyeth-Whitehall Pharmaceuticals Inc.. [20-2262] Craig Reilly [Entered: 12/31/2020 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Garrington Group LTD and Liquid Captial Exchange Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000871984] [20-2262] Theresa Queen [Entered: 12/28/2020 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Theresa A. Queen for Garrington Group LTD and Liquid Captial Exchange Inc.. [1000871974] [20-2262] Theresa Queen [Entered: 12/28/2020 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wyeth-Whitehall Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000871837] [20-2262] Craig Reilly [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Company Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000871835] [20-2262] Craig Reilly [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000871831] [20-2262] Craig Reilly [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pfizer Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000871827] [20-2262] Craig Reilly [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pfizer Global Manufacturing. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000871825] [20-2262] Craig Reilly [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER filed deferring action on Motion for transcript at government expense filed by Appellant Edwin A. Algarin-Moure [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Algarin Moure. [1000864874] [20-2262] AW [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCUMENTS in Spanish by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure. [1000864871] [20-2262] AW [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [6] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Algarin Moure. [1000864859] [20-2262] AW [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure for transcript at government expense. [1000862711] [20-2262] AW [Entered: 12/09/2020 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket(#6) IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure. [20-2262] AW [Entered: 12/09/2020 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00743-LO-IDD. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-2262] AW [Entered: 11/30/2020 07:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 12/09/2020. [20-2262] AW [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Algarin Moure. Informal Opening Brief due 12/21/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-2262] AW [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FEE NOTICE issued to Edwin A. Algarin-Moure - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 12/28/2020 Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00743-LO-IDD. Mailed to: Algarin Moure. [20-2262] AW [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00743-LO-IDD. Case manager: AWalker. [20-2262] AW [Entered: 11/25/2020 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pfizer Global Manufacturing is a litigant

Latest cases where ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITEDSTATES is a litigant