This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/21/2022 at 06:19:06 (UTC).

Edward Pringle v. Governor of Alabama, et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 Edward Pringle filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Governor of Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10895

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

EDWARD L. PRINGLE

Atmore, AL 36503-3700

Defendant / Appellees

WEXFORD MEDICAL SOURCES, INC., Medical Provider

DOCTOR PAPERONIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Edward L. Pringle

Attorney at Holman CF - Inmate Legal Mail

Holman 3700

Atmore, AL 36503-3700

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Philip Guy Piggott

Attorney at Webster Henry Bradwell Cohan Speagle & DeShazo, PC

2 Perimeter Pk S Ste 445 E

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

DC #28 Order

Open Document #3

DC #29 Judgment

Open Document #4

PLRA-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form and CIP filed by Party Edward L. Pringle. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 04/22/2022 09:48 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Edward L. Pringle. [Entered: 04/21/2022 12:31 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Edward L. Pringle. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9650429-1] [Entered: 04/21/2022 03:42 PM]

Open Document

USDC Order Denying appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees Assessed. Filed on 04/20/2022. Docket Entry 34. [Entered: 05/16/2022 12:01 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC Order Denying appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees Assessed. Filed on 04/20/2022. Docket Entry 34. [Entered: 05/16/2022 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Edward L. Pringle. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9650429-1] [Entered: 04/21/2022 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Edward L. Pringle. [Entered: 04/21/2022 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form and CIP filed by Party Edward L. Pringle. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 04/22/2022 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Edward L. Pringle on 03/21/2022. Fee Status: USDC motion Pending: Motion for Leave to Proceed; Dkt #32 03/21/2022. [Entered: 03/25/2022 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford Medical Sources, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Piggott