This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 06:01:39 (UTC).

Edward Hopkins v. Commissioner Social Security

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Edward Hopkins filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2437

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

EDWARD J. HOPKINS

Defendant / Appellee

COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Sheryl G. Mazur Esq.

195 Fairfield Avenue

West Caldwell, NJ 07006

Sarah H. Bohr Esq.

Attorney at Bohr & Harrington

2337 Seminole Road

Atlantic Beach, FL 32233

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Roxanne Andrews Esq.

Attorney at Social Security Administration

300 Spring Garden Street, 6Th Floor, P.O. Box 41777

Philadelphia, PA 19123

Jordana Cooper Esq.

Attorney at Social Security Administration

300 Spring Garden Street, 6Th Floor, P.O. Box 41777

Philadelphia, PA 19123

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Standing Order

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

Transcript Scheduling Order

Open Restricted Document #1

Transcript Scheduling Order Issued

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Restricted Document #4

Standing_Order_Excess_ Pagination_010912

Open Restricted Document #3

Case_Caption

Open Restricted Document #2

District_Court_Order_042519

Open Restricted Document #1

Notice of Appeal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Edward J. Hopkins due on or before 09/18/2019. Appendix due on or before 09/18/2019. (ARR) [Entered: 08/09/2019 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) filed by for the date(s) of April 25, 2019. Transcripts were filed in the District Court on 07/15/2019. [19-2437] (LAL) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Administrative Record, filed. [19-2437] (JC) [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER to Court Reporter Lisa A. Larsen directing transcripts for the date of May 13, 2018, ordered on 07/11/2019 , to be filed by 08/13/2019. (DW) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Edward J. Hopkins, filed. [19-2437] (SHB) [Entered: 07/11/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Edward J. Hopkins advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: May 13, 2018 oral ruling only, to be filed by Lisa A. Larsen. [19-2437] (SHB) [Entered: 07/11/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Edward J. Hopkins, filed. [19-2437] (SHB) [Entered: 07/11/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jordana Cooper on behalf of Appellee(s) Andrew Saul. [19-2437] (JC) [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah H. Bohr on behalf of Appellant(s) Edward J. Hopkins. [19-2437] (SHB) [Entered: 07/10/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) [Entered: 06/28/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Edward J. Hopkins in District Court No. 2-17-cv-13430. (DW) [Entered: 06/28/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less