This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/12/2021 at 06:09:32 (UTC).

Edward Blum, et al v. Banner Health, et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Edward Blum, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Banner Health,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15860

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendants

DEBBIE FLORES, CEO Banner Boswell Medical Center and Banner Del E Webb Medical Center

PETER FINE, named as Executive Officer of Banner Health

CALIFRONIA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS

Defendant / Appellees

BANNER DEL E WEBB MEDICAL CENTER, Emergency Department

BANNER BOSWELL EMERGENCY DEPARTMENT

BANNER HEALTH, an Arizona Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellants

NANCY BLUM

Sun City, AZ 85351

EDWARD BLUM

Sun City, AZ 85351

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Sigurds Michael Krolls

Attorney at Campbell, Yost, Clare & Norell, P.C.

3101 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nancy Blum

10710 W Camden Avenue

Sun City, AZ 85351

Edward Blum

10710 W Camden Avenue

Sun City, AZ 85351

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MANDATE ISSUED. (BGS, JHN and RDN) [12163124] (RL) [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed order (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN and RYAN D. NELSON): A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Medhekar v. United States Dist. Court, 99 F.3d 325, 326 (9th Cir. 1996) (discovery orders not immediately appealable); KL Group v. Case, Kay & Lynch, 829 F.2d 909, 918 n.5 (9th Cir. 1987) (protective order prohibiting disclosure of inadvertently disclosed document not an appealable interlocutory order). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12141523] (RT) [Entered: 06/11/2021 09:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Edward Blum and Nancy Blum opening brief due 07/09/2021. Appellees Banner Boswell Emergency Department, Banner Del E Webb Medical Center and Banner Health answering brief due 08/09/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12111664] (JBS) [Entered: 05/13/2021 09:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Banner Del Webb Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Banner Health is a litigant