This case was last updated from PACER on 06/15/2021 at 06:14:26 (UTC).

Easom v. US Well Service

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Easom filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against US Well Service. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-20202

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

John Nau

Adrian Howard

Scott Easom

Defendant / Appellee

US Well Services, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Galvin Bernard Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Law Firm, L.L.P.

2925 Richmond Avenue

Houston, TX 77098

Gabriel Amin Assaad

Attorney at McDonald Worley, P.C.

1770 St. James Place

Houston, TX 77056

Matthew Stephen Yezierski

Attorney at McDonald Worley, P.C.

1770 Saint James Place

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David Matthew Korn Esq.

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, L.L.P.

365 Canal Street, 1 Canal Place

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

Open Document

DISCOUNT OF 10% invoked. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Johnny Sanchez. To avoid further action the transcript must be filed by 07/01/2021. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 07/01/2021 for Johnny Sanchez, Court Reporter [21-20202] (JMW) [Entered: 06/14/2021 10:23 AM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Reptr-1 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20202] (Matthew Stephen Yezierski ) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:13 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Scott Easom, Mr. Adrian Howard and Mr. John Naufor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/29/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Assaad, Kennedy; Attorney for Appellee: Korn. [21-20202] (Gabriel Amin Assaad ) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:09 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Gabriel Amin Assaad for Mr. Scott Easom, Mr. Adrian Howard and Mr. John Nau for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20202] (Gabriel Amin Assaad ) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:06 PM]

Open Document #2

MOT-11 Letter

Open Document #1

Court Order

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Scott Easom, Mr. Adrian Howard and Mr. John Nau [21-20202] (CAG) [Entered: 04/16/2021 01:15 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOUNT OF 10% invoked. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Johnny Sanchez. To avoid further action the transcript must be filed by 07/01/2021. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 07/01/2021 for Johnny Sanchez, Court Reporter [21-20202] (JMW) [Entered: 06/14/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Johnny Sanchez. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Johnny Sanchez, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 04/29/2021. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 06/01/2021 for Johnny Sanchez, Court Reporter [21-20202] (CCR) [Entered: 05/17/2021 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Gabriel Amin Assaad for Appellant John Nau in 21-20202, Attorney Gabriel Amin Assaad for Appellant Adrian Howard in 21-20202, Attorney Gabriel Amin Assaad for Appellant Scott Easom in 21-20202, by Attorney(s) Matthew Stephen Yezierski for party(s) Appellant John Nau Appellant Scott Easom Appellant Adrian Howard, in case 21-20202 [21-20202] (ABT) [Entered: 05/03/2021 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Scott Easom, Mr. Adrian Howard and Mr. John Nau. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Johnny Sanchez, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 01/15/2021. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 05/10/2021 for Johnny Sanchez, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9562467-2 ] [21-20202] (CCR) [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20202] (Matthew Stephen Yezierski ) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Scott Easom, Mr. Adrian Howard and Mr. John Naufor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/29/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Assaad, Kennedy; Attorney for Appellee: Korn. [21-20202] (Gabriel Amin Assaad ) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Gabriel Amin Assaad for Mr. Scott Easom, Mr. Adrian Howard and Mr. John Nau for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20202] (Gabriel Amin Assaad ) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketFEE PAID by Appellants Mr. Scott Easom, Mr. Adrian Howard and Mr. John Nau. Fee deadline satisfied [21-20202] (CCR) [Entered: 04/23/2021 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERMISSION TO APPEAL GRANTED. Case transferred from miscellaneous case number 21-90010. Fee due on 05/03/2021 for Appellants Scott Easom, Adrian Howard and John Nau. Transcript order due on 05/03/2021 for Appellants Scott Easom, Adrian Howard and John Nau [21-20202] (CAG) [Entered: 04/16/2021 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Scott Easom, Mr. Adrian Howard and Mr. John Nau [21-20202] (CAG) [Entered: 04/16/2021 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S WELL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Korn