This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/19/2022 at 06:05:39 (UTC).

Early Warning Services, LLC v. Grecia

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Early Warning Services, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Grecia. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2318

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

WILLIAM GRECIA

GRECIA ESTATE HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel J. Goettle Esq.

Cira Centre, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2891

K. Lee Marshall Esq.

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

George Gerhard Brell

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

211 North Broadway, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

George C. Chen

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

2 North Central Avenue, Suite 2200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew Michael Wawrzyn

Attorney at Wawrzyn LLC

200 East Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Andrew A. Chirls

Ten Penn Center Suite 1100, 1801 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 13 ] filed by Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC.; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [819070] [JCW] [Entered: 12/16/2021 08:42 AM]

#13

(#13) MOTION of Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Service: 12/15/2021 by email. [819052] [21-2318] [K. Marshall] [Entered: 12/15/2021 07:46 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC. The opening brief is due 12/17/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [810875] [LMS] [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:13 PM]

11 #3

Certificate of Interest

11 #2

Declaration ISO

11 #1

Motion

#10

#9

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 13 ] filed by Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC.; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [819070] [JCW] [Entered: 12/16/2021 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION of Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Service: 12/15/2021 by email. [819052] [21-2318] [K. Marshall] [Entered: 12/15/2021 07:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC. The opening brief is due 12/17/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [810875] [LMS] [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION of Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC to extend the time to 12/17/2021 to file brief. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809217] [21-2318] [K. Marshall] [Entered: 10/29/2021 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corrected Entry of appearance for K. Lee Marshall; George C. Chen; George G. Brell as counsel for Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC. Service: 10/04/2021 by email. [803501] [21-2318] [George Brell] [Entered: 10/04/2021 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 10/08/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [803055] [JCW] [Entered: 10/01/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC. Service: 09/30/2021 by email. [802962] [21-2318] [George Brell] [Entered: 09/30/2021 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC. Service: 09/30/2021 by email. [802961] [21-2318] [George Brell] [Entered: 09/30/2021 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for K. Lee Marshall; George C. Chen; George G. Brell as counsel for Appellant Early Warning Services, LLC. Service: 09/30/2021 by email. [802960] [21-2318] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[803054-1] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 9 ] [George Brell] [Entered: 09/30/2021 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Grecia Estate Holdings LlC and William Grecia. Service: 09/28/2021 by email. [802313] [21-2318] [Matthew Wawrzyn] [Entered: 09/28/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Matthew Michael Wawrzyn as counsel for Appellees Grecia Estate Holdings LlC and William Grecia. Service: 09/28/2021 by email. [802312] [21-2318] [Matthew Wawrzyn] [Entered: 09/28/2021 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Grecia Estate Holdings LlC and William Grecia. Service: 09/28/2021 by email. [802310] [21-2318] [Matthew Wawrzyn] [Entered: 09/28/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/08/2021. [799981] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/30/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/30/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/30/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 11/15/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 09/16/2021 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Grecia Estate Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Early Warning Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW A. CHIRLS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew M. Wawrzyn