This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/04/2021 at 06:13:13 (UTC).

E. Ohman J:or Fonder AB, et al v. NVIDIA Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 E Ohman J or Fonder AB filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against NVIDIA Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15604

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRON WORKERS LOCAL 580 JOINT FUNDS

Defendants

OAKLAND COUNTY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM

OAKLAND COUNTY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM TRUST

OAKLAND COUNTY VOLUNTARY EMPLOYEES' BENEFIT ASSOCIATION TRUST

Defendant / Appellees

COLETTE KRESS

NVIDIA CORPORATION

JEFF FISHER

JENSEN HUANG

Plaintiff / Appellants

STICHTING PENSIOENFONDS PGB, Lead Plaintiffs

E. OHMAN J:OR FONDER AB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John Dwyer

Attorney at Cooley LLP

4401 Eastgate Mall

San Diego, CA 92121-1909

Brett Hom De Jarnette

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Samantha Kirby

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Patrick Edward Gibbs

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Sarah M. Lightdale

Attorney at Cooley LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew L. Mustokoff

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Eric Gerard

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Andrew L. Zivitz

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Jennifer L. Joost Esquire

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

One Sansome Street, Suite 1850

San Francisco, CA 94104

Lauren Michelle Cruz

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2575

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael Mathai

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Rachel M. Cherington

Attorney at Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC

485 Lexington Avenue, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Jonathan D. Uslaner

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2575

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gregory P.N. Joseph

Attorney at Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC

485 Lexington Avenue, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

John Browne

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#12

#19

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12118855] (BLS) [Entered: 05/19/2021 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#18) Added Attorney(s) Rachel M. Cherington for party(s) Appellant E. Ohman J:or Fonder AB Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB, in case 21-15604. [12097763] (DJV) [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#17) Added Attorney(s) Gregory P.N. Joseph for party(s) Appellant E. Ohman J:or Fonder AB Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB, in case 21-15604. [12097751] (DJV) [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rachel M. Cherington (Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC, 485 Lexington Ave., 30th Fl., New York, NY 10017) for Appellants E. Ohman J:or Fonder AB and Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB. Date of service: 04/30/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12097734] [21-15604] (Cherington, Rachel) [Entered: 04/30/2021 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#15) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gregory P. Joseph (Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC, 485 Lexington Ave., 30th Fl., New York, NY 10017) for Appellants E. Ohman J:or Fonder AB and Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB. Date of service: 04/30/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12097729] [21-15604] (Joseph, Gregory) [Entered: 04/30/2021 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#14) Added Attorney(s) Sarah M. Lightdale for party(s) Appellee Jeff Fisher Appellee Colette Kress Appellee Jensen Huang Appellee NVIDIA Corporation, in case 21-15604. [12083614] (DJV) [Entered: 04/22/2021 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah M. Lightdale (Cooley LLP 55 Hudson Yards, New York, New York 10001) for Appellees Jensen Huang, Colette Kress, Jeff Fisher and NVIDIA Corporation. Date of service: 04/22/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12083596] [21-15604] (Lightdale, Sarah) [Entered: 04/22/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/19/2021, 10:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12079626] (BLS) [Entered: 04/19/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#11) Added Attorney(s) Michael Mathai for party(s) Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB, in case 21-15604. [12071198] (DJV) [Entered: 04/12/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) John Browne for party(s) Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB, in case 21-15604. [12071170] (DJV) [Entered: 04/12/2021 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael M. Mathai (Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP 1251 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10020) for Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB. Date of service: 04/12/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12071081] [21-15604] (Mathai, Michael) [Entered: 04/12/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John C. Browne (Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP 1251 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10020) for Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB. Date of service: 04/12/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12071065] [21-15604] (Browne, John) [Entered: 04/12/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Lauren Michelle Cruz for party(s) Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB, in case 21-15604. [12071049] (DJV) [Entered: 04/12/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lauren Cruz (Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP 2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2575 Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB. Date of service: 04/12/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12071001] [21-15604] (Cruz, Lauren) [Entered: 04/12/2021 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Jonathan D. Uslaner for party(s) Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB, in case 21-15604. [12070884] (DJV) [Entered: 04/12/2021 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jonathan D. Uslaner (Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP 2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2575 Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellant Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB. Date of service: 04/12/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12070867] [21-15604] (Uslaner, Jonathan) [Entered: 04/12/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/09/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12070077]. [21-15604] (AD) [Entered: 04/09/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants E. Ohman J:or Fonder AB and Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/09/2021. [12069511] [21-15604] (Joost, Jennifer) [Entered: 04/09/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants E. Ohman J:or Fonder AB and Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/12/2021. Transcript ordered by 05/03/2021. Transcript due 06/03/2021. Appellants E. Ohman J:or Fonder AB and Stichting Pensioenfonds PGB opening brief due 07/12/2021. Appellees Jeff Fisher, Jensen Huang, Colette Kress and NVIDIA Corporation answering brief due 08/12/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12063978] (RT) [Entered: 04/05/2021 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oakland County Employees' Retirement System is a litigant

Latest cases where Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds is a litigant

Latest cases where Nvidia Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Leo Mustokoff(Designation Retained)