This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/22/2020 at 06:23:31 (UTC).

DynCorp International, LLC v. US

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 DynCorp International, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2041

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

FLUOR INTERCONTINENTAL, INC.

KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC.

PAE-PARSONS GLOBAL LOGISTICS SERVICES, LLC

VECTRUS SYSTEMS CORPORATION

UNITED STATES

Plaintiff / Appellant

DYNCORP INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew E. Shipley

Paul Reinherz Wolfson Esq.

Philip Edward Beshara Esq.

Lee Paul Curtis

Seth Locke

Julia M. Fox

Dan L. Bagatell

Anuj Vohra

Zachary H. Schroeder

Christian Curran

Seth W. Lloyd

Kevin P. Mullen

Deanne Maynard

William Porter Rayel

Gregory T. Omalley

Dana J. Chase Esq.

Scott Nicholas Flesch

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Collin White

Aaron Martin Panner

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#24) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [719774] [JAL] [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Fluor Intercontinental, Inc.. Service: 08/24/2020 by email. [716926] [20-2041] [Andrew Shipley] [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 08/24/2020 by email. [716883] [20-2041] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docketing Statement for the Appellee PAE-Parsons Global Logistics Services, LLC. Service: 08/24/2020 by email. [716808] [20-2041] [Anuj Vohra] [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 08/21/2020 by email. [716604] [20-2041] [Seth Locke] [Entered: 08/21/2020 02:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 08/21/2020 by email. [716459] [20-2041] [William Rayel] [Entered: 08/21/2020 10:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713276] [20-2041] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 08/07/2020 10:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Certificate of Interest for Appellee PAE-Parsons Global Logistics Services, LLC. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712507] [20-2041] [Anuj Vohra] [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Entry of appearance for Anuj Vohra; Christian N. Curran; Zachary H. Schroeder as counsel for Appellee PAE-Parsons Global Logistics Services, LLC. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712504] [20-2041] [Anuj Vohra] [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Fluor Intercontinental, Inc.. Service: 07/31/2020 by email. [711706] [20-2041] [Andrew Shipley] [Entered: 07/31/2020 04:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee US, Entry of Appearance [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 08/07/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [711516] [EKD] [Entered: 07/31/2020 09:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Deanne E. Maynard; Kevin P. Mullen; Seth W. Lloyd as counsel for Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 07/30/2020 by email. [711305] [20-2041] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for William P. Rayel; Scott N. Flesch; Dana J. Chase; LTC Gregory T. O'Malley as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 07/30/2020 by email. [711208] [20-2041] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [William Rayel] [Entered: 07/30/2020 09:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant DynCorp International, LLC indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 07/27/2020 by email. [710435] [20-2041] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 07/27/2020 06:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant DynCorp International, LLC. Service: 07/27/2020 by email. [710434] [20-2041] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 07/27/2020 06:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant DynCorp International, LLC. Service: 07/27/2020 by email. [710433] [20-2041] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 07/27/2020 06:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Aaron M. Panner; Collin R. White as counsel for Appellant DynCorp International, LLC. Service: 07/27/2020 by email. [710432] [20-2041] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 07/27/2020 06:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 07/24/2020 by email. [710034] [20-2041] [Seth Locke] [Entered: 07/24/2020 05:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Seth H. Locke; Dan L. Bagatell; Lee P. Curtis; Julia M. Fox as counsel for Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 07/24/2020 by email. [710032] [20-2041] [Seth Locke] [Entered: 07/24/2020 05:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/10/2020. [710004] Entry of Appearance is due 08/07/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/07/2020. Docketing Statement is due 08/24/2020. Appellant's brief is due 09/22/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 07/24/2020 03:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less