This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/22/2020 at 06:23:31 (UTC).

DynCorp International, LLC v. US

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 DynCorp International, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2041

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

FLUOR INTERCONTINENTAL, INC.

KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC.

PAE-PARSONS GLOBAL LOGISTICS SERVICES, LLC

VECTRUS SYSTEMS CORPORATION

UNITED STATES

Plaintiff / Appellant

DYNCORP INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew E. Shipley

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Paul Reinherz Wolfson Esq.

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Philip Edward Beshara Esq.

Attorney at WilmerHale LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Lee Paul Curtis

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

700 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Seth Locke

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

700 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Julia M. Fox

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

700 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Dan L. Bagatell

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

3 Weatherby Road

Hanover, NH 03755

Anuj Vohra

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Zachary H. Schroeder

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Christian Curran

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Seth W. Lloyd

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kevin P. Mullen

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Deanne Maynard

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

William Porter Rayel

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Gregory T. Omalley

Attorney at US Army Legal Services Agency

9275 Gunston Road, Building 1450

Fort Belvoir, VA 22060

Dana J. Chase Esq.

Attorney at U.S. Army Legal Service Agency

9275 Gunston Road, Building 1450

Fort Belvoir, VA 22060

Scott Nicholas Flesch

Attorney at US Army Legal Services Agency

9275 Gunston Road

Fort Belvoir, VA 22060-5546

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Collin White

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Aaron Martin Panner

Attorney at Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

1615 M Street, Nw, Sumner Square

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#24) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [719774] [JAL] [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Fluor Intercontinental, Inc.. Service: 08/24/2020 by email. [716926] [20-2041] [Andrew Shipley] [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 08/24/2020 by email. [716883] [20-2041] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docketing Statement for the Appellee PAE-Parsons Global Logistics Services, LLC. Service: 08/24/2020 by email. [716808] [20-2041] [Anuj Vohra] [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 08/21/2020 by email. [716604] [20-2041] [Seth Locke] [Entered: 08/21/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 08/21/2020 by email. [716459] [20-2041] [William Rayel] [Entered: 08/21/2020 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713276] [20-2041] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 08/07/2020 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Certificate of Interest for Appellee PAE-Parsons Global Logistics Services, LLC. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712507] [20-2041] [Anuj Vohra] [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Entry of appearance for Anuj Vohra; Christian N. Curran; Zachary H. Schroeder as counsel for Appellee PAE-Parsons Global Logistics Services, LLC. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712504] [20-2041] [Anuj Vohra] [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Fluor Intercontinental, Inc.. Service: 07/31/2020 by email. [711706] [20-2041] [Andrew Shipley] [Entered: 07/31/2020 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee US, Entry of Appearance [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 08/07/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [711516] [EKD] [Entered: 07/31/2020 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Deanne E. Maynard; Kevin P. Mullen; Seth W. Lloyd as counsel for Appellee Vectrus Systems Corporation. Service: 07/30/2020 by email. [711305] [20-2041] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for William P. Rayel; Scott N. Flesch; Dana J. Chase; LTC Gregory T. O'Malley as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 07/30/2020 by email. [711208] [20-2041] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [William Rayel] [Entered: 07/30/2020 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant DynCorp International, LLC indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 07/27/2020 by email. [710435] [20-2041] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 07/27/2020 06:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant DynCorp International, LLC. Service: 07/27/2020 by email. [710434] [20-2041] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 07/27/2020 06:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant DynCorp International, LLC. Service: 07/27/2020 by email. [710433] [20-2041] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 07/27/2020 06:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Aaron M. Panner; Collin R. White as counsel for Appellant DynCorp International, LLC. Service: 07/27/2020 by email. [710432] [20-2041] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 07/27/2020 06:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 07/24/2020 by email. [710034] [20-2041] [Seth Locke] [Entered: 07/24/2020 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Seth H. Locke; Dan L. Bagatell; Lee P. Curtis; Julia M. Fox as counsel for Appellee Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Service: 07/24/2020 by email. [710032] [20-2041] [Seth Locke] [Entered: 07/24/2020 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/10/2020. [710004] Entry of Appearance is due 08/07/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/07/2020. Docketing Statement is due 08/24/2020. Appellant's brief is due 09/22/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 07/24/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLUOR INTERCONTINENTAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DYNCORP INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Vectrus Systems Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant