This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:09 (UTC).

Dylan Whitehead v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Dylan Whitehead filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Andrew Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35586

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant

DYLAN J. WHITEHEAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher John Brackett Esquire

Attorney at SSA - SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

701 Fifth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98104-7075

Kerry Keefe

Attorney at DOJ-Office of the U.S. Attorney

700 Stewart Street

Seattle, WA 98101

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Eitan Kassel Yanich

203 4Th Ave. East

Olympia, WA 98501

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the Ninth Cir. Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See FRAP 33 & Ninth Cir.R. 33-1. Mediation assessment conferences are not routinely scheduled in social security appeals. Csl are encouraged to contact circuit mediator if they believe this social security appeal has remand potential or is otherwise amenable to resolution. Specifically, csl are requested to contact the mediator if claimant has been awarded benefits after the district court's decision or if claimant is deceased. The mediator can also assist csl with procedural matters that may lead to the resolution of an appeal. Csl for the party contacting the Mediation Program are encouraged to copy csl for the other party to the appeal on any such requests. Info regarding the medation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11375656] (LW) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:34 PM]

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • (#6) Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Dylan J. Whitehead to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Dylan J. Whitehead opening brief due 10/10/2019. Appellee Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security answering brief due 11/12/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11425641] (JN) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Dylan J. Whitehead. New requested due date is 10/10/2019. [11425540] [19-35586] (Yanich, Eitan) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the Ninth Cir. Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See FRAP 33 & Ninth Cir.R. 33-1. Mediation assessment conferences are not routinely scheduled in social security appeals. Csl are encouraged to contact circuit mediator if they believe this social security appeal has remand potential or is otherwise amenable to resolution. Specifically, csl are requested to contact the mediator if claimant has been awarded benefits after the district court's decision or if claimant is deceased. The mediator can also assist csl with procedural matters that may lead to the resolution of an appeal. Csl for the party contacting the Mediation Program are encouraged to copy csl for the other party to the appeal on any such requests. Info regarding the medation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11375656] (LW) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11372553][19-35586] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Dylan J. Whitehead Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11372060] [19-35586] (Yanich, Eitan) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/22/2019. Appellant Dylan J. Whitehead opening brief due 09/10/2019. Appellee Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security answering brief due 10/10/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11363013] (JMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.