This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/11/2020 at 06:31:11 (UTC).

Dylan Jones v. Liberty Mutual, et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Dylan Jones filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Liberty Mutual. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15907

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

LIBERTY MUTUAL

STEPHEN TOGNETTI

AMBER CRUZ

Plaintiff / Appellant

DYLAN LLOYD JONES

Folsom, CA 95763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher J. Truxler

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2350

Sacramento, CA 95814

Nicole Ann Baarts

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dylan Lloyd Jones

Attorney at FSP - FOLSOM STATE PRISON

P.O. Box 950

Folsom, CA 95763

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Received copy of District Court order filed on 06/19/2020 granting defs mtn for attys fees [11729023] (CW) [Entered: 06/22/2020 11:10 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Dylan Lloyd Jones motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/20/2020. [11699934] (CW) [Entered: 05/22/2020 05:53 PM]

#3

(#3) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Dylan Lloyd Jones opening brief of 14 pages (Informal: No). Served on 04/30/2020. Major deficiency: fees are due. [11693674] (KWG) [Entered: 05/18/2020 11:32 AM]

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received copy of District Court order filed on 06/19/2020 granting defs mtn for attys fees [11729023] (CW) [Entered: 06/22/2020 11:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Dylan Lloyd Jones motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/20/2020. [11699934] (CW) [Entered: 05/22/2020 05:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Dylan Lloyd Jones opening brief of 14 pages (Informal: No). Served on 04/30/2020. Major deficiency: fees are due. [11693674] (KWG) [Entered: 05/18/2020 11:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11691143] (CKP) [Entered: 05/14/2020 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Dylan Lloyd Jones opening brief due 07/14/2020. Appellees Amber Cruz, Liberty Mutual and Stephen Tognetti answering brief due 08/14/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11688776] (RT) [Entered: 05/12/2020 04:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant