This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 06:01:09 (UTC).

Dwayne Harvard v. Christopher Cesnalis, et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Dwayne Harvard filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Christopher Cesnalis. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1012

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DANIEL L. BEATTY

CHRISTOPHER J. CESNALIS

Plaintiff / Appellant

DWAYNE HARVARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott A. Bradley Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Sandra A. Kozlowski Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Michael J. Scarinci Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Daniel B. Mullen Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Joel S. Sansone Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of Joel Sansone

603 Stanwix Street, Two Gateway Center, Suite 1290

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Elizabeth Tuttle Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of Joel Sansone

603 Stanwix Street, Two Gateway Center, Suite 1290

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Elizabeth A. Tuttle Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of Joel Sansone

603 Stanwix Street, Two Gateway Center, Suite 1290

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Joel S. Sansone, Esq., Elizabeth Tuttle, Esq., Scott A. Bradley, Esq., Sandra A. Kozlowski, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 01/16/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:02 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Harvard. Certificate of Service dated 02/24/2020 by ECF. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 02/24/2020 02:47 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Harvard. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:23 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Dwayne Harvard advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:25 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joel S. Sansone on behalf of Appellant(s) Dwayne Harvard. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:22 PM]

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #5

JUDGMENT

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Harvard. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020 by ECF. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 02/24/2020 02:49 PM]

1 #4

MEMORANDUM OPINION

#1

Case Opening Letter

10 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

1 #2

Case Caption

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael Scarinci on behalf of Appellee(s) Christopher Cesnalis, Daniel Beatty. [20-1012] (MJS) [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:06 AM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) Christopher J. Cenalis and Daniel L. Beatty. [20-1012] (DBM) [Entered: 01/14/2020 03:31 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Harvard. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:26 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Dwayne Harvard. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:28 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael Scarinci on behalf of Appellee(s) Christopher Cesnalis, Daniel Beatty. [20-1012] (MJS) [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#14) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Dwayne Harvard - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to Brief). (MS) [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#13) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Dwayne Harvard - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 02/26/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Harvard. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020 by ECF. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 02/24/2020 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Harvard. Certificate of Service dated 02/24/2020 by ECF. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 02/24/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Harvard due on or before 02/24/2020. Appendix due on or before 02/24/2020. (SB) [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) Christopher J. Cenalis and Daniel L. Beatty. [20-1012] (DBM) [Entered: 01/14/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Dwayne Harvard. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Harvard. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Dwayne Harvard advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Dwayne Harvard. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joel S. Sansone on behalf of Appellant(s) Dwayne Harvard. [20-1012] (JSS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Joel S. Sansone, Esq., Elizabeth Tuttle, Esq., Scott A. Bradley, Esq., Sandra A. Kozlowski, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 01/16/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Dwayne Harvard in District Court No. 2-17-cv-00505. (LMR) [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less