This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:24 (UTC).

Dwayne Baker v. Harold Clarke

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Dwayne Baker filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Harold Clarke. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7026

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

DEWAYNE BAKER, a/k/a Dwayne Baker

Waverly, VA 23891-2222

Respondent / Appellee

HAROLD CLARKE, Director, VDOC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

DeWayne Baker

Attorney at SUSSEX II STATE PRISON

24427 Musselwhite Drive

Waverly, VA 23891-2222

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Carson Vorhis

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Ann-Marie Catherine White

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER filed [1000554333] deferring action on Motion to appoint/assign counsel until briefing complete [ # 7 ]. Copies to all parties.. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:19 PM]

10 #1

Correction request

#7

(#7) MOTION by DeWayne Baker to appoint/assign counsel. Date and method of service: 07/24/2019 US mail. [1000554303] [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:00 PM]

#1

(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 7:18-cv-00620-JLK-JCH. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/12/2019. Case manager: CathyHerb. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:20 PM]

3 #2

form(s) sent

14 #1

Informal opening brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

10 #2

form(s) sent

3 #1

Fee notice

#11

(#11) ORDER filed [1000554326] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 8 ] Number of days granted: 14. Informal Opening Brief due 08/22/2019. Copies to all parties.. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:17 PM]

#9

(#9) MOTION by DeWayne Baker to IFP (insufficient). Date and method of service: 07/24/2019 US mail. [1000554310] [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:04 PM]

#8

(#8) MOTION by DeWayne Baker to extend filing time for informal opening brief. Date and method of service: 07/24/2019 US mail. [1000554307] [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:03 PM]

#5

(#5) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: D. Baker. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019 [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:32 PM]

14 #2

Envelope

#6

(#6) Letter by DeWayne Baker . [1000554299] [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:59 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by DeWayne Baker. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 08/23/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#13) IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by DeWayne Baker. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 08/23/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER filed [1000554333] deferring action on Motion to appoint/assign counsel until briefing complete [ # 7 ]. Copies to all parties.. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER filed [1000554326] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 8 ] Number of days granted: 14. Informal Opening Brief due 08/22/2019. Copies to all parties.. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Docket correction requested from DeWayne Baker. Mailed to: D. Baker. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by DeWayne Baker to IFP (insufficient). Date and method of service: 07/24/2019 US mail. [1000554310] [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by DeWayne Baker to extend filing time for informal opening brief. Date and method of service: 07/24/2019 US mail. [1000554307] [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by DeWayne Baker to appoint/assign counsel. Date and method of service: 07/24/2019 US mail. [1000554303] [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter by DeWayne Baker . [1000554299] [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: D. Baker. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019 [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FEE NOTICE issued to DeWayne Baker - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 08/14/2019. Originating case number: 7:18-cv-00620-JLK-JCH. Mailed to: D. Baker. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#2) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 7:18-cv-00620-JLK-JCH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case?No [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 7:18-cv-00620-JLK-JCH. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/12/2019. Case manager: CathyHerb. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7026] CT [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.