This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 06:08:33 (UTC).

Dutcher v. Bold Films, et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Dutcher filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Bold Films. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4165

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS HOME ENTERTAINMENT LLC

OPEN ROAD FILMS, LLC

NBC UNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC

BOLD FILM PRODUCTIONS, LLC

BOLD FILMS LP

Plaintiff / Appellant

RICHARD DUTCHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stephen Clark Mouritsen

Attorney at Parr Brown Gee & Loveless

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jeffrey James Hunt

Attorney at Parr Brown Gee & Loveless

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

David C. Reymann

Attorney at Parr Brown Gee & Loveless

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jeremy M. Brodis

Attorney at Parr Brown Gee & Loveless

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Cheylynn Hayman

Attorney at Parr Brown Gee & Loveless

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Perry Clegg

Attorney at Kunzler Bean & Adamson

50 West Broadway, Suite 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Stephen Silverman

Attorney at Stephen Silverman Law

6945 East Sahuaro Drive, Suite 125

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10709879] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Appellees are directed to file a response to the court's December 30, 2019 order or to Appellant's response thereto. Response due on 01/28/2020 for Bold Film Productions, LLC, Bold Films LP, NBC Universal Media, LLC, Open Road Films, LLC and Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC. Parties are instructed to file documents specifically related to this appeal only. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of the court. Served on 01/14/2020. [19-4165] [Entered: 01/14/2020 03:07 PM]

Open Document

[10709508] Response filed by Mr. Richard Dutcher in 19-4165, 19-4126 to Served on 01/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4165]--[Edited 01/15/2020 by JM PDF removed from case number 19-4126. ] SS [Entered: 01/13/2020 04:56 PM]

Open Document

[10707051] Supplemental preliminary record which includes the 12/04/2019 amended judgment and plaintiff's second amended notice appeal. [19-4165] [Entered: 01/03/2020 12:25 PM]

Open Document

[10705873] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Appellant is directed to show cause in writing why he has not waived his right to appellate review of the district courts 10/29/19 order awarding costs by failing to object to the Bill of Costs filed by Defendants in the district court. Response due on 01/13/2020 for Richard Dutcher. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of the court. Served on 12/30/2019. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/30/2019 09:53 AM]

Open Document

[10705412] Deficiency notice issued. Fee is now due by 01/02/2020 for Richard Dutcher. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:38 PM]

Open Document

[10705411] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/26/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 02/04/2020 for Richard Dutcher. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:36 PM]

Open Document

[10704676] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Silverman for Mr. Richard Dutcher. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:26 AM]

Open Document

[10704660] Notice received from Mr. Richard Dutcher in 19-4165, 19-4126 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/23/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4165] --[Edited 12/26/2019 by SLS to remove docket entry from 19-4126.] SS [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:01 AM]

Open Document

[10704659] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Richard Dutcher in 19-4165, 19-4126. Served on 12/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4165] --[Edited 12/26/2019 by SLS to remove docket entry from 19-4126.] SS [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:59 AM]

Open Document

[10702256] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Preliminary documents are past due. Docketing statement, Fee, Notice of appearance and Transcript order form now due by 12/23/2019 for Richard Dutcher. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/13/2019 08:30 AM]

Open Document

[10702250] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying without prejudice to renewal Appellant's motion to dismiss case filed by Richard Dutcher. All previously established deadlines remain in effect. Served on 12/13/2019. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/13/2019 08:23 AM]

Open Document

[10701565] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Richard Dutcher to dismiss case. Served on: 12/11/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4165] SS [Entered: 12/11/2019 12:20 PM]

Open Document

[10700053] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeremy M. Brodis, Ms. Cheylynn Hayman, Mr. Jeffrey James Hunt, Mr. Stephen Clark Mouritsen and Mr. David C Reymann for Bold Films LP, Bold Film Productions, LLC, Open Road Films, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC and Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:31 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10709879] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Appellees are directed to file a response to the court's December 30, 2019 order or to Appellant's response thereto. Response due on 01/28/2020 for Bold Film Productions, LLC, Bold Films LP, NBC Universal Media, LLC, Open Road Films, LLC and Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC. Parties are instructed to file documents specifically related to this appeal only. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of the court. Served on 01/14/2020. [19-4165] [Entered: 01/14/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10709508] Response filed by Mr. Richard Dutcher in 19-4165, 19-4126 to Served on 01/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4165]--[Edited 01/15/2020 by JM PDF removed from case number 19-4126. ] SS [Entered: 01/13/2020 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10707051] Supplemental preliminary record which includes the 12/04/2019 amended judgment and plaintiff's second amended notice appeal. [19-4165] [Entered: 01/03/2020 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10705873] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Appellant is directed to show cause in writing why he has not waived his right to appellate review of the district courts 10/29/19 order awarding costs by failing to object to the Bill of Costs filed by Defendants in the district court. Response due on 01/13/2020 for Richard Dutcher. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of the court. Served on 12/30/2019. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/30/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • [10705427] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 12/26/2019. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/26/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10705412] Deficiency notice issued. Fee is now due by 01/02/2020 for Richard Dutcher. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10705411] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/26/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 02/04/2020 for Richard Dutcher. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • [10704797] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/30/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4165] [Entered: 12/23/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10704676] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Silverman for Mr. Richard Dutcher. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10704660] Notice received from Mr. Richard Dutcher in 19-4165, 19-4126 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/23/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4165] --[Edited 12/26/2019 by SLS to remove docket entry from 19-4126.] SS [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10704659] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Richard Dutcher in 19-4165, 19-4126. Served on 12/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4165] --[Edited 12/26/2019 by SLS to remove docket entry from 19-4126.] SS [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • [10704658] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen E. Silverman for Appellant Mr. Richard Dutcher in 19-4165, 19-4126 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4165, 19-4126] --[Edited 12/23/2019 by SLS to remove docket entry from 19-4126 and to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SS [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10702256] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Preliminary documents are past due. Docketing statement, Fee, Notice of appearance and Transcript order form now due by 12/23/2019 for Richard Dutcher. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/13/2019 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10702250] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying without prejudice to renewal Appellant's motion to dismiss case filed by Richard Dutcher. All previously established deadlines remain in effect. Served on 12/13/2019. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/13/2019 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701565] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Richard Dutcher to dismiss case. Served on: 12/11/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4165] SS [Entered: 12/11/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10700053] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeremy M. Brodis, Ms. Cheylynn Hayman, Mr. Jeffrey James Hunt, Mr. Stephen Clark Mouritsen and Mr. David C Reymann for Bold Films LP, Bold Film Productions, LLC, Open Road Films, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC and Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4165] [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • [10700025] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey J. Hunt, David C. Reymann, Cheylynn Hayman, Stephen C. Mouritsen, Jeremy M. Brodis for Appellees Bold Film Productions, LLC, Bold Films LP, NBC Universal Media, LLC, Open Road Films, LLC and Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4165]--[Edited 12/04/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 12/4/19.] DCR [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698566] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/26/2019 Fee is due by 12/11/2019 for Richard Dutcher. Docketing statement due 12/11/2019 for Richard Dutcher. Transcript order form due 12/11/2019 for Richard Dutcher. Notice of appearance due on 12/11/2019 for Bold Film Productions, LLC, Bold Films LP, Richard Dutcher, NBC Universal Media, LLC, Open Road Films, LLC and Universal Studios Home Entertainment LLC. [19-4165] [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.