This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/31/2022 at 06:04:50 (UTC).

Duolingo, Inc. v. Modern Font Applications LLC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 Duolingo, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Modern Font Applications LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1215

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

DUOLINGO, INC.

Defendant / Appellant

MODERN FONT APPLICATIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Gregory Sobolski

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gabriel K. Bell

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Richard Gregory Frenkel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Diane Ghrist

Attorney at Diane Ghrist

555 Eleventh Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Perry S. Clegg

Attorney at Johnson & Martin, P.A.

50 West Broadway, Suite 900

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

2 #1

Motion

#2

supporting document

#3

(#3) ORDER filed directing Duolingo, Inc., within seven days from the date of filing of this order, to respond to Modern Font's Rule 8 motion. Modern Font may reply no later than three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [816340] [LMS] [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:08 AM]

#4

(#4) Amended docket sheet from United States District Court for the Northern District of California. [817024] [JCW] [Entered: 12/08/2021 09:01 AM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Gregory K. Sobolski;Gabriel K. Bell;Richard G. Frenkel;Diane E. Ghrist as counsel for Appellee Duolingo, Inc.. Service: 12/13/2021 by email. [818286] [22-1215] [Gregory Sobolski] [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:49 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Duolingo, Inc.. Service: 12/13/2021 by email. [818287] [22-1215] [Gregory Sobolski] [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:52 PM]

#7

(#7) RESPONSE of Appellee Duolingo, Inc. to Doc No. [ # 2 ]. Service: 12/13/2021 by email. [818336] [22-1215] [Gregory Sobolski] [Entered: 12/13/2021 07:02 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Duolingo, Inc.. Service: 12/16/2021 by email. [819407] [22-1215] [Gregory Sobolski] [Entered: 12/16/2021 05:34 PM]

#9

(#9) REPLY of Appellant Modern Font Applications LLC to response [ # 7 ]. Service: 12/16/2021 by email. [819426] [22-1215] [Perry Clegg] [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:54 PM]

#10

(#10) Entry of appearance for Perry S. Clegg as counsel for Appellant Modern Font Applications LLC. Service: 12/17/2021 by email. [819428] [22-1215] [Perry Clegg] [Entered: 12/17/2021 03:31 AM]

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Modern Font Applications LLC. Service: 12/17/2021 by email. [819429] [22-1215] [Perry Clegg] [Entered: 12/17/2021 03:34 AM]

#12

(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Modern Font Applications LLC. Service: 12/17/2021 by email. [819430] [22-1215] [Perry Clegg] [Entered: 12/17/2021 03:35 AM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed terminating appeal; The appeal is dismissed, and the court denies the motion for a stay and mandamus relief. Each side shall bear its own costs. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [826696] [LMS] [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:49 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER filed terminating appeal; The appeal is dismissed, and the court denies the motion for a stay and mandamus relief. Each side shall bear its own costs. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [826696] [LMS] [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Modern Font Applications LLC. Service: 12/17/2021 by email. [819430] [22-1215] [Perry Clegg] [Entered: 12/17/2021 03:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Modern Font Applications LLC. Service: 12/17/2021 by email. [819429] [22-1215] [Perry Clegg] [Entered: 12/17/2021 03:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Perry S. Clegg as counsel for Appellant Modern Font Applications LLC. Service: 12/17/2021 by email. [819428] [22-1215] [Perry Clegg] [Entered: 12/17/2021 03:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY of Appellant Modern Font Applications LLC to response [ # 7 ]. Service: 12/16/2021 by email. [819426] [22-1215] [Perry Clegg] [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Duolingo, Inc.. Service: 12/16/2021 by email. [819407] [22-1215] [Gregory Sobolski] [Entered: 12/16/2021 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE of Appellee Duolingo, Inc. to Doc No. [ # 2 ]. Service: 12/13/2021 by email. [818336] [22-1215] [Gregory Sobolski] [Entered: 12/13/2021 07:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Duolingo, Inc.. Service: 12/13/2021 by email. [818287] [22-1215] [Gregory Sobolski] [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Gregory K. Sobolski;Gabriel K. Bell;Richard G. Frenkel;Diane E. Ghrist as counsel for Appellee Duolingo, Inc.. Service: 12/13/2021 by email. [818286] [22-1215] [Gregory Sobolski] [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended docket sheet from United States District Court for the Northern District of California. [817024] [JCW] [Entered: 12/08/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER filed directing Duolingo, Inc., within seven days from the date of filing of this order, to respond to Modern Font's Rule 8 motion. Modern Font may reply no later than three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [816340] [LMS] [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION of Appellant Modern Font Applications LLC for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8/18. Service: 12/03/2021 by email. [816212] [22-1215] [Perry Clegg] [Entered: 12/03/2021 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/01/2021. [815884] Entry of Appearance is due on 12/16/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/16/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 12/16/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 01/31/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 12/02/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MODERN FONT APPLICATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perry S. Clegg