This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2021 at 05:15:37 (UTC).

Dual Diagnosis Treatment Cente, et al v. Centene Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Dual Diagnosis Treatment Cente filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Centene Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55962

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Claimants

LAST CHANCE FUNDING INC.

FLORENTINE HOLDING COMPANY V, LLC

Defendants

LIANN GOHARI

KENNETH B. JULIAN

JOHN LEBLANC

ILEANA MARIA HERNANDEZ

Plaintiff / Appellants

DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation

SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation

ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation

SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation

SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation

SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation

SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation

SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation

VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation

Defendant / Appellees

CENTENE CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

MICHAEL NEIDORFF, an individual

HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation

MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC., a Delaware corporation

OPTUM SERVICES, INC., a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Sander R. Dawson

Attorney at Dawson & Rosenthal, PC

402 W. Broadway, Suite 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

Lisa S. Kantor Esquire

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor, LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Anita Rosenthal Esquire

Attorney at Dawson & Rosenthal, P.C.

25 Schnebly Hill Road

Sedona, AZ 86336-4233

Timothy J. Rozelle Esquire

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor, LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven M. Cady

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Alan Jay Weil Esquire

Attorney at Kendall Brill & Klieger LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jordan Shae Altura

Attorney at Gordon Rees LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

A. Louis Dorny Esquire

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

633 W 5Th Street, 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc. and Vedanta Laboratories, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/14/2021. Appellants Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc. and Vedanta Laboratories, Inc. opening brief due 11/08/2021. Appellees Centene Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff and Optum Services, Inc. answering brief due 12/08/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12221441] (RT) [Entered: 09/07/2021 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAST CHANCE FUNDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant