This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/02/2022 at 06:01:50 (UTC).

Drivetrain v. Kozel

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 Drivetrain filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Kozel. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    18-3218

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellant

DRIVETRAIN, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for Abengoa Bioenergy US Holding, LLC, et al.

Debtor

ABENGOA BIOENERGY BIOMASS OF KANSAS, LLC

Appellee

MARK D. KOZEL, as Liquidating Trustee of the ABBK Liquidating Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Mark V. Bossi

Attorney at Thompson Coburn

One Us Bank Plaza, 28Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-0000

David Dunn

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

390 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Ronald J. Silverman

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

390 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Nathaniel Scott Boyer

Attorney at Hearst Corporation

300 West 57Th Street

New York, NY 10019-3741

Debtor Attorney

Christine L. Schlomann

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2617

Appellee Attorneys

Michael A. VanNiel

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

Key Tower, 127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Kelly S. Burgan

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

Key Tower, 127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Adam L. Fletcher

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

Key Tower, 127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Joint Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 3

Open Document #2

Joint Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 2

Open Document #1

Joint Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 1

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Memorandum and Order

Open Document #2

Final Judgment

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10742847] Mandate issued. [18-3120, 18-3218] [Entered: 05/27/2020 07:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10737854] Judgment for opinion filed. [18-3120, 18-3218] [Entered: 05/05/2020 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10737851] Affirmed and Dismissed; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published. Judges Tymkovich (authoring judge), Baldock and Holmes. Mandate to issue. [18-3120, 18-3218] [Entered: 05/05/2020 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10680760] Case argued bu David Dunn for the appellant; and by Michael VanNiel for the appellee; and submitted to Judges Tymkovich, Baldock and Holmes. [18-3120, 18-3218] [Entered: 09/23/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10666569] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Drivetrain, LLC in 18-3120, 18-3218. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3120, 18-3218] DD [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10666434] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Mark D. Kozel in 18-3120, 18-3218. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3120, 18-3218] MAV [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10666402] Calendar notice sent to counsel. Arguments to be held on 09/23/2019 at 3:30 pm in Courtroom I of the Byron White United States Courthouse, Denver, CO. Arguing counsel is required to go to http://www.ca10.uscourts.gov under the argument calendar tab to obtain an important notice regarding calendared cases and required forms. The updated calendar acknowledgment form must be completed and filed with the clerk via Electronic Case Filing within 10 days of today's date. [18-3120, 18-3218] [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10666396] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellee's motion to reschedule oral argument in 18-3120 and 18-3218. This matter is rescheduled and will be argued Monday, September 23, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. Served on 07/29/2019. [18-3120, 18-3218] [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10666209] Motion filed by Appellee Mark D. Kozel in 18-3120, 18-3218 to reschedule oral argument. Served on: 07/26/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [18-3120, 18-3218] MAV [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10660503] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Mark D. Kozel in 18-3120. Served on 07/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3120, 18-3218] MAV [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10600457] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Drivetrain, LLC. Served on: 10/26/2018. Manner of Service: email. [18-3218] MVB [Entered: 10/26/2018 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10600455] Docketing statement filed by Drivetrain, LLC. Served on 10/26/2018. Manner of Service: email. [18-3218] --[Edited 10/26/2018 by SLS to note the docketing statement has been cited as deficient.] MVB [Entered: 10/26/2018 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Docket[10600449] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark V. Bossi for Appellant Drivetrain, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/26/2018. Manner of Service: email. [18-3218]--[Edited 10/26/2018 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] MVB [Entered: 10/26/2018 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10597758] Entry of appearance filed by Michael A. VanNiel for Mark D. Kozel. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. (More than 50) Served on 10/16/2018. Manner of Service: US mail [18-3218] [Entered: 10/16/2018 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10597755] Entry of appearance filed by Kelly S. Burgan for Mark D. Kozel. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 10/16/2008. Manner of Service: US mail. [18-3218] [Entered: 10/16/2018 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10597747] Entry of appearance filed by Adam L. Fletcher for Mark D. Kozel. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 10/16/2018. Manner of Service: US mail [18-3218] [Entered: 10/16/2018 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Docket[10597746] Entry of appearance submitted by Kelly S. Burgan for Appellee Mark D. Kozel for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/16/2018. Manner of Service: US mail. [18-3218]--[Edited 10/16/2018 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] KSB [Entered: 10/16/2018 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Docket[10597744] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael A. VanNiel for Appellee Mark D. Kozel for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/16/2018. Manner of Service: US mail. [18-3218] --[Edited 10/16/2018 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 10/16/18] MAV [Entered: 10/16/2018 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Docket[10597743] Entry of appearance submitted by Adam L. Fletcher for Appellee Mark D. Kozel for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/16/2018. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 10/16/2018 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 10/16/18][18-3218] ALF [Entered: 10/16/2018 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10597307] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/15/2018 Docketing statement due 10/29/2018 for Drivetrain, LLC. Transcript order form due 10/29/2018 for Drivetrain, LLC. Notice of appearance due on 10/29/2018 for Abengoa Bioenergy Biomass of Kansas, LLC, Drivetrain, LLC and Mark D. Kozel [18-3218] [Entered: 10/15/2018 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABENGOA BIOENERGY BIOMASS OF KANSAS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DRIVETRAIN, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for Abengoa Bioenergy US Holding, LLC, et al. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Dunn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald J. Silverman