This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/11/2022 at 06:10:32 (UTC).

Drevaleva v. DOVA, et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Drevaleva filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DOVA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2139

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TATYANA EVGENIEVNA DREVALEVA

San Francisco, CA 94116

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

DENIS RICHARD MCDONOUGH, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs

ROBERT WILKIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva

251 Magellan Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94116

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Christine H. Lyman

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

201 3Rd Street Nw, Suite 900, P.O. Box 607

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10884725] "The First Emergency Motion for Permission for the Electronic Case Filing in Appeal No. 21-2139 ..." filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva for permission to file electronically. Served on 01/06/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:30 PM]

Open Document

[10884723] First Motion to Strike AUSA Ms. Lyman's Entry of Appearance in Appeal No. 21-2139 filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 01/06/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:27 PM]

Open Document

[10884717] "Second Emergency Motion to Stay Appeal No. 21-2139 and Cancel the Deadline of Janaury 12, 2022 for Filing Opening Brief..." filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 01/06/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:15 PM]

Open Document

[10884715] "Reply to AUSA Ms. Lyman's Response to My Emergency Motion to Stay Appeal No. 21-2139 ..." filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva [ # 10882811-2 ]. Served on 01/06/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:10 PM]

Open Document

[10884711] "Motion for Permission to Exceed a Page and A word Count Limitations in My Reply to AUSA Ms. Lyman's Response to My Emergency Motion to Stay Appeal No. 21-2139." filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 01/04/2022. Manner of Service: Email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:05 PM]

Open Document

[10883819] Notice of change of address filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/05/2022 12:19 PM]

Open Document

[10883817] Request to Take Judicial Notice in Support of Reply filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 01/03/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/05/2022 12:16 PM]

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Reply

Open Document

[10875319] Designation of record filed by Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 11/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/29/2021 02:08 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

[10874687] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Abatement of this appeal is lifted pursuant to the district court's disposition of Appellants motion for altering or amending judgment. Appellant shall file an entry of appearance and pay the filing fee to the district court or file an application for leave to proceed on appeal without prepayment of fees on or before December 13, 2021. Appellant's motion for permission to file electronically is granted. See order for details. Served on 11/24/2021. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:38 AM]

Open Document

[10874372] Appellant's motion filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva for permission to file electronically. Served on 11/16/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/23/2021 11:36 AM]

Open Document

[10874352] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: Memorandum Opinion and Order filed November 19, 2021 along with a copy of the docket sheet and entries. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/23/2021 11:27 AM]

Open Document

[10874310] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Christine H. Lyman for DOVA, Mr. Robert Wilkie and Denis Richard McDonough. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/23/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-2139] [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:34 AM]

Open Document

[10872139] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case. When the dispositive order is entered by the district court, the clerk of the district court is directed to supplement the preliminary record. See attached order for details. Served on 11/15/2021. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/15/2021 10:13 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Prelim ROA

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10884725] "The First Emergency Motion for Permission for the Electronic Case Filing in Appeal No. 21-2139 ..." filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva for permission to file electronically. Served on 01/06/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10884723] First Motion to Strike AUSA Ms. Lyman's Entry of Appearance in Appeal No. 21-2139 filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 01/06/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10884717] "Second Emergency Motion to Stay Appeal No. 21-2139 and Cancel the Deadline of Janaury 12, 2022 for Filing Opening Brief..." filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 01/06/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10884715] "Reply to AUSA Ms. Lyman's Response to My Emergency Motion to Stay Appeal No. 21-2139 ..." filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva [ # 10882811-2 ]. Served on 01/06/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10884711] "Motion for Permission to Exceed a Page and A word Count Limitations in My Reply to AUSA Ms. Lyman's Response to My Emergency Motion to Stay Appeal No. 21-2139." filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 01/04/2022. Manner of Service: Email. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10883819] Notice of change of address filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/05/2022 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10883817] Request to Take Judicial Notice in Support of Reply filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 01/03/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/05/2022 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10883815] Reply to Response to My First Motion to Disqualify filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva [ # 10882299-2 ]. Served on 01/03/2022. Manner of Service:. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/05/2022 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10883811] Appellant's Motion for Permission to Exceed a Page and a Word Count Limitations in My Reply filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 01/03/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/05/2022 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10883456] Reply to Response to Emergency Motion for Injunction filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva to [ # 10882811-2 ]. Served on 01/04/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 01/04/2022 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10875321] Pro se docketing statement filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 11/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/29/2021 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10875319] Designation of record filed by Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Served on 11/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/29/2021 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10875316] Appellant's motion filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 11/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/29/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10874687] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Abatement of this appeal is lifted pursuant to the district court's disposition of Appellants motion for altering or amending judgment. Appellant shall file an entry of appearance and pay the filing fee to the district court or file an application for leave to proceed on appeal without prepayment of fees on or before December 13, 2021. Appellant's motion for permission to file electronically is granted. See order for details. Served on 11/24/2021. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10874372] Appellant's motion filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva for permission to file electronically. Served on 11/16/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/23/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10874352] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: Memorandum Opinion and Order filed November 19, 2021 along with a copy of the docket sheet and entries. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/23/2021 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10874310] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Christine H. Lyman for DOVA, Mr. Robert Wilkie and Denis Richard McDonough. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/23/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-2139] [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket[10874309] Entry of appearance submitted by Christine H. Lyman for Appellees DOVA, Denis Richard McDonough and Mr. Robert Wilkie for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/23/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-2139]--[Edited 11/23/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 11/23/2021] CHL [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10872139] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case. When the dispositive order is entered by the district court, the clerk of the district court is directed to supplement the preliminary record. See attached order for details. Served on 11/15/2021. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/15/2021 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10871790] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/12/2021 Notice of appearance due on 12/13/2021 for Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva, and Notice of appearance due on 11/26/2021 for Denis Richard McDonough, United States Department of Veterans Affairs and Robert Wilkie. Fee or ifp forms due 12/13/2021 for Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. [21-2139] [Entered: 11/12/2021 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less