This case was last updated from PACER on 04/29/2019 at 09:30:06 (UTC).

Draper, et al v. Healey

Case Summary

On 04/14/2015 Draper filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Healey. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-1429

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMONWEALTH SECOND AMENDMENT, INC.

Amicus Curiae

BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE

LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE

Plaintiff / Appellants

ROBERT BOUDRIE

ARIEL WEISBERG

PRECISION POINT FIREARMS, LLC

BRENT CARLTON

CONCORD ARMORY, LLC

ROBERT DRAPER

DONNA MAJOR

SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.

ERIC NOTKIN

Defendant / Appellee

MAURA T. HEALEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Alexander Aron Flig

490 Chapman St

Canton, MA 02021

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

John E. Roberts

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

1 International Pl, 22Nd Flr

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Laura E. Stafford

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

1 International Pl, 22Nd Flr

Boston, MA 02110-0000

L. Scott Harshbarger

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

1 International Pl, 22Nd Flr

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Kimberly A. Mottley

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

1 International Pl, 22Nd Flr

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Matthew Struhar

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

1300 Clinton Sq

Rochester, NY 14604

David Henry Tennant

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

1300 Clinton Sq

Rochester, NY 14604

Lynnette NoguerasTrummer

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

1300 Clinton Sq

Rochester, NY 14604

W. Daniel Deane

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

900 Elm St

Manchester, NH 03101-2031

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lydia E. French

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Glenn Stuart Kaplan

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

William W. Porter

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Julia Eleanor Kobick

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE issued. [15-1429] (CP)

Open Document

ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; David H. Souter, Associate Supreme Court Justice*; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge; Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge; William J. Kayatta , Jr., Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Robert Draper, Ariel Weisberg, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Precision Point Firearms, LLC and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. *Hon. David H. Souter, Associate Justice (Ret.) of the Supreme Court of the US sitting by designation. [15-1429] (CP)

Open Document

ORDER entered by David H. Souter, Associate Supreme Court Justice*: Plaintiffs-Appellants' motion for leave to file a corrected petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc that is also oversized is allowed. *Hon. David H. Souter, Associate Justice (Ret.) of the Supreme Court of the United States, sitting by designation. [15-1429] (CP)

Open Document #2

Corrected Petition (7/7/2016) to be Substituted for Original Peition (7/1/2016)

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

PETITION for rehearing/rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. Certificate of service dated 07/07/2016. [15-1429]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (AAF)

Open Document

PETITION for hearing en banc filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. [15-1429] (AAF)

Open Document

PETITION for hearing en banc filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. Certificate of service dated 07/01/2016. [15-1429] (AAF)

Open Document

JUDGMENT. Affirmed [15-1429] (CP)

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 05/14/2015, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Glenn Stuart Kaplan for Maura T. Healey and Laura E. Stafford for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [15-1429] (CP)

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #1

transcript order form

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2015. [15-1429] (AAF)

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg filed by Attorney Alexander Aron Flig. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2015. [15-1429] (AAF)

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2015. [15-1429] (AAF)

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

district court record

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE issued. [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; David H. Souter, Associate Supreme Court Justice*; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge; Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge; William J. Kayatta , Jr., Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Robert Draper, Ariel Weisberg, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Precision Point Firearms, LLC and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. *Hon. David H. Souter, Associate Justice (Ret.) of the Supreme Court of the US sitting by designation. [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered by David H. Souter, Associate Supreme Court Justice*: Plaintiffs-Appellants' motion for leave to file a corrected petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc that is also oversized is allowed. *Hon. David H. Souter, Associate Justice (Ret.) of the Supreme Court of the United States, sitting by designation. [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to file Corrected Petition for Panel Rehearing or Hearing En Banc instanter filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2016. [15-1429] (AAF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION for rehearing/rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. Certificate of service dated 07/07/2016. [15-1429]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (AAF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION for hearing en banc filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. [15-1429] (AAF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION for hearing en banc filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. Certificate of service dated 07/01/2016. [15-1429] (AAF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT. Affirmed [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • OPINION issued by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge; David H. Souter, Associate Supreme Court Justice* and William J. Kayatta , Jr., Appellate Judge. Published. *Hon. David H. Souter, Associate Justice (Ret.) of the Supreme Court of the United States, sitting by designation. [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to citation of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) [ # 5990784-2 ] filed by Appellee Maura T. Healey. Certificate of service was not included. [15-1429]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JEK)

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2015
  • NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Debra Lajoie: 02/19/2015, Motion hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Maura T. Healey filed by Attorney Julia Kobick. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2015. [15-1429] (JEK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Glenn Stuart Kaplan for Maura T. Healey and Laura E. Stafford for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Maura T. Healey filed by Attorney William W. Porter. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2015. [15-1429] (WWP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 05/14/2015, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Glenn Stuart Kaplan for Maura T. Healey and Laura E. Stafford for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Robert Draper indicating the following transcript has ordered: 02/19/2015, Motion hearing. Transcript due 06/29/2015 from Court Reporter Debra Lajoie. [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2015. [15-1429] (AAF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg filed by Attorney Alexander Aron Flig. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2015. [15-1429] (AAF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2015. [15-1429] (AAF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #47) filed by Appellants Robert Boudrie, Brent Carlton, Concord Armory, LLC, Robert Draper, Donna Major, Eric Notkin, Precision Point Firearms, LLC, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Ariel Weisberg. Docketing Statement due 04/28/2015. Transcript Report/Order form due 04/28/2015. Appearance form due 04/28/2015. [15-1429] (CP)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Second Amendment Foundation is a litigant