This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/13/2021 at 06:08:13 (UTC).

Dr. A. v. Hochul

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Dr A filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hochul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2566

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Dr. A.

Nurse A.

Dr. C.

Nurse D.

Dr. F.

Dr. G.

Therapist I.

Dr. J.

Nurse J.

Dr. M.

Nurse N.

Dr. O.

Dr. P.

Technologist P.

Dr. S.

Nurse S.

Physician Liaison X.

Defendant / Appellants

Kathy Hochul, Governor of the State of New York, in her official capacity

Howard A. Zucker, Commissioner of the New York State Department of Health, in his official capacity

Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, in her official capacity

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher A. Ferrara Esq.

Attorney at Thomas More Society

420 Route 46 East

Fairfield, NJ 07004

Stephen M. Crampton Esq.

Attorney at Thomas More Society

309 West Washington Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael McHale Esq.

Attorney at Thomas More Society

10506 Burt Circle

Omaha, NE 68114

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Mark Stephen Grube Esq.

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Steven Wu

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Other Attorneys

Rachel N. Morrison

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

131 M St Ne

Washington, DC 20507

 

Court Documents

#97

(#97) MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Former EEOC Employees and Title VII Religious Accommodation Experts, FILED. Service date12/09/2021 by CM/ECF.[3225668] [21-2566]--[Edited 12/09/2021 by KYY] [Entered: 12/09/2021 12:22 PM]

#96

(#96) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Former EEOC Employees and Title VII Religious Accommodation Experts, FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3225364] [21-2566]--[Edited 12/09/2021 by KYY] [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:56 PM]

#95

(#95) MOTION ORDER, denying as moot motion to extend time [ # 89 ] filed by Appellee Dr. A., Nurse A., Dr. C., Nurse D., Dr. F., Dr. G., Therapist I., Dr. J., Nurse J., Dr. M., Nurse N., Dr. O., Dr. P., Technologist P., Dr. S., Nurse S. and Physician Liaison X., by SLC, FILED. [3222933][95] [21-2566] [Entered: 12/03/2021 04:21 PM]

92 #2

Supporting Document

92 #1

Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc FILED

#89

(#89) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee Dr. A., Dr. C., Dr. F., Dr. G., Dr. J., Dr. M., Dr. O., Dr. P., Dr. S., Nurse A., Nurse D., Nurse J., Nurse N., Nurse S., Physician Liaison X., Technologist P. and Therapist I., FILED. Service date 11/30/2021 by CM/ECF. [3219976] [21-2566] [Entered: 11/30/2021 03:00 PM]

#88

(#88) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc by 12/02/2021 [ # 84 ] filed by Appellee Dr. A., Nurse A., Dr. C., Nurse D., Dr. F., Dr. G., Therapist I., Dr. J., Nurse J., Dr. M., Nurse N., Dr. O., Dr. P., Technologist P., Dr. S., Nurse S. and Physician Liaison X., by SLC, FILED. [3212194][88] [21-2566] [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:08 PM]

#84

(#84) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee Dr. A., Dr. C., Dr. F., Dr. G., Dr. J., Dr. M., Dr. O., Dr. P., Dr. S., Nurse A., Nurse D., Nurse J., Nurse N., Nurse S., Physician Liaison X., Technologist P. and Therapist I., FILED. Service date 11/15/2021 by CM/ECF. [3211180] [21-2566] [Entered: 11/15/2021 02:41 PM]

#79

(#79) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 11/12/2021, to NDNY (SYRACUSE), ISSUED.[3210374] [21-2566] [Entered: 11/12/2021 04:59 PM]

#15

#14

#8

#4

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • Docket(#98) NEW PARTY, Movant Former EEOC Employees and Title VII Religious Accommodation Experts, ADDED.[3225862] [21-2566] [Entered: 12/09/2021 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Former EEOC Employees and Title VII Religious Accommodation Experts, FILED. Service date12/09/2021 by CM/ECF.[3225668] [21-2566]--[Edited 12/09/2021 by KYY] [Entered: 12/09/2021 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Former EEOC Employees and Title VII Religious Accommodation Experts, FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3225364] [21-2566]--[Edited 12/09/2021 by KYY] [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) MOTION ORDER, denying as moot motion to extend time [ # 89 ] filed by Appellee Dr. A., Nurse A., Dr. C., Nurse D., Dr. F., Dr. G., Therapist I., Dr. J., Nurse J., Dr. M., Nurse N., Dr. O., Dr. P., Technologist P., Dr. S., Nurse S. and Physician Liaison X., by SLC, FILED. [3222933][95] [21-2566] [Entered: 12/03/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellee Dr. A., Dr. C., Dr. F., Dr. G., Dr. J., Dr. M., Dr. O., Dr. P., Dr. S., Nurse A., Nurse D., Nurse J., Nurse N., Nurse S., Physician Liaison X., Technologist P. and Therapist I., FILED. Service date 12/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3221824] [21-2566] [Entered: 12/02/2021 11:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee Dr. A., Dr. C., Dr. F., Dr. G., Dr. J., Dr. M., Dr. O., Dr. P., Dr. S., Nurse A., Nurse D., Nurse J., Nurse N., Nurse S., Physician Liaison X., Technologist P. and Therapist I., FILED. Service date 11/30/2021 by CM/ECF. [3219976] [21-2566] [Entered: 11/30/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc by 12/02/2021 [ # 84 ] filed by Appellee Dr. A., Nurse A., Dr. C., Nurse D., Dr. F., Dr. G., Therapist I., Dr. J., Nurse J., Dr. M., Nurse N., Dr. O., Dr. P., Technologist P., Dr. S., Nurse S. and Physician Liaison X., by SLC, FILED. [3212194][88] [21-2566] [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee Dr. A., Dr. C., Dr. F., Dr. G., Dr. J., Dr. M., Dr. O., Dr. P., Dr. S., Nurse A., Nurse D., Nurse J., Nurse N., Nurse S., Physician Liaison X., Technologist P. and Therapist I., FILED. Service date 11/15/2021 by CM/ECF. [3211180] [21-2566] [Entered: 11/15/2021 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 11/12/2021, to NDNY (SYRACUSE), ISSUED.[3210374] [21-2566] [Entered: 11/12/2021 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) OPINION, clarifying the 11/04/2021 opinion, per curiam, by JMW, RDS, SLC, FILED.[3210362] [21-2566] [Entered: 11/12/2021 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Dr. A., Dr. C., Dr. F., Dr. G., Dr. J., Dr. M., Dr. O., Dr. P., Dr. S., Nurse A., Nurse D., Nurse J., Nurse N., Nurse S., Physician Liaison X., Technologist P. and Therapist I., FILED. Service date 10/14/2021 by CM/ECF. [3192627] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[3192567] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#10) CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 10/27/2021, SET.[3192477] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER, directing appeals 21-2179 and 21-2566 to be heard in tandem. The briefing schedule in Dr. A. v. Hochul is set as follows: Appellants brief is due October 18, 2021, at noon; Appellees brief is due October 22, 2021, at noon; and the Reply brief is due October 25, 2021 at noon. Oral argument will be held in both appeals on October 27, 2021, at 2:00 p.m.. by SLC, FILED.[3192453] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Kathy Hochul, Letitia James and Howard A. Zucker, FILED. Service date 10/14/2021 by CM/ECF.[3192344] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY, Mark S. Grube, [ # 4 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[3192181] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Kathy Hochul, Letitia James and Howard A. Zucker, FILED. Service date 10/14/2021 by CM/ECF. [3192179] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3192154] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/12/2021, RECEIVED.[3192153] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Kathy Hochul, Letitia James and Dr. Howard A. Zucker, FILED. [3192142] [21-2566] [Entered: 10/14/2021 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where F91917-1384782 is a litigant

Latest cases where THE M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Dr. O is a litigant

Latest cases where G AND A STUCCO AND WIRE LATHE is a litigant