This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 06:06:59 (UTC).

Dowe v. Prudential Financial Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Dowe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Prudential Financial Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Eric Schwimmer

Prudential Financial Inc., parent and successor in interest to Prudential Securities Incorporated

Gerald E. Harper

Prudential Securities Incorporated

Prudential Financial Inc., successor to Prudential Securities Inc.

Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton and Garrison, LLP

Leeds and Morelli

John Does 1-25, fictitous persons and entities

Defendant / Appellants

Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP

Steven A. Morelli

Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC

Lenard Leeds

Leeds and Morelli, PC

Leeds Brown Law P.C.

Jeffrey K. Brown

Plaintiff / Appellees

Elvie Moore

Maureen Dowe, individually and on behalf of those Class Members similarly situated

Esther Buckram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Janice J. DiGennaro

Attorney at Rivkin Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

Cheryl F. Korman

Attorney at Rivkin Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

John W. Moscow

Attorney at Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [ # 30 ] filed by Appellants-Cross-Appellees, Maureen Dowe, Elvie Moore and Esther Buckram, by MHP, FILED. [2790124][34] [19-4246, 20-16] [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:38 PM]

30 #2

Declaration in Support

30 #1

Motion FILED

#10

(#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey K. Brown, Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli, FILED. Service date 01/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2754837] [20-16] [Entered: 01/16/2020 05:08 PM]

#9

(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey K. Brown, Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli, FILED. Service date 01/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2754834] [20-16] [Entered: 01/16/2020 05:07 PM]

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Esther Buckram, Maureen Dowe and Elvie Moore, FILED. Service date 01/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2750786] [20-16] [Entered: 01/13/2020 02:57 PM]

#59

(#29) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to respond to motion to dismiss, [ # 2773059-2 ] filed by Appellant-Cross-Appellee Maureen Dowe, Elvie Moore and Esther Buckram in 19-4246, by SLC, FILED. [2778693][29] [19-4246, 20-16] [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:11 AM]

#46

(#20) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Jeffrey K. Brown, Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli in 19-4246, FILED. Service date 01/31/2020 by CM/ECF. [2767313] [19-4246, 20-16] [Entered: 01/31/2020 04:13 PM]

#45

(#19) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Jeffrey K. Brown, Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli in 19-4246, FILED. Service date 01/31/2020 by CM/ECF. [2767227] [19-4246, 20-16] [Entered: 01/31/2020 03:44 PM]

#43

(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC, Steven A. Morelli and Jeffrey K. Brown in 20-16, FILED. Service date 01/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2756933] [20-16, 19-4246] [Entered: 01/21/2020 03:29 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 11/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2743736] [20-16] [Entered: 01/03/2020 08:03 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [ # 30 ] filed by Appellants-Cross-Appellees, Maureen Dowe, Elvie Moore and Esther Buckram, by MHP, FILED. [2790124][34] [19-4246, 20-16] [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Esther Buckram, Maureen Dowe and Elvie Moore in 19-4246, Appellee Esther Buckram, Maureen Dowe and Elvie Moore in 20-16, FILED. Service date 02/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2784229] [19-4246, 20-16] [Entered: 02/21/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to respond to motion to dismiss, [ # 2773059-2 ] filed by Appellant-Cross-Appellee Maureen Dowe, Elvie Moore and Esther Buckram in 19-4246, by SLC, FILED. [2778693][29] [19-4246, 20-16] [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Jeffrey K. Brown, Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli in 19-4246, FILED. Service date 01/31/2020 by CM/ECF. [2767313] [19-4246, 20-16] [Entered: 01/31/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Jeffrey K. Brown, Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli in 19-4246, FILED. Service date 01/31/2020 by CM/ECF. [2767227] [19-4246, 20-16] [Entered: 01/31/2020 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY, Cheryl F. Korman for Leeds Brown Law P.C. Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC, Lenard Leeds, Leeds and Morelli, PC ,Steven A. Morelli , Jeffrey K. Brown, in case 20-16, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2757116] [20-16] [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC, Steven A. Morelli and Jeffrey K. Brown in 20-16, FILED. Service date 01/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2756933] [20-16, 19-4246] [Entered: 01/21/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey K. Brown, Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli, FILED. Service date 01/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2756918] [20-16] [Entered: 01/21/2020 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER, dated 01/21/2020, dismissing appeal by 02/04/2020, unless Appellants Jeffrey K. Brown, Lenard Leeds, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli, submit an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[2756432] [20-16] [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey K. Brown, Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli, FILED. Service date 01/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2754837] [20-16] [Entered: 01/16/2020 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey K. Brown, Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Lenard Leeds, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli, FILED. Service date 01/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2754834] [20-16] [Entered: 01/16/2020 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Esther Buckram, Maureen Dowe and Elvie Moore, FILED. Service date 01/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2750786] [20-16] [Entered: 01/13/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTE: See lead case, 19-4246, containing complete set of docket entries.[2743740] [20-16] [Entered: 01/03/2020 08:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2743738] [20-16] [Entered: 01/03/2020 08:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Jeffrey K. Brown, Lenard Leeds, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli, district court receipt # ANYSDC-18409166, FILED.[2743737] [20-16] [Entered: 01/03/2020 08:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 11/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2743736] [20-16] [Entered: 01/03/2020 08:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Jeffrey K. Brown, Lenard Leeds, Leeds Brown Law P.C., Leeds and Morelli, PC, Leeds, Morelli and Brown LLP, Leeds, Morelli and Brown PC and Steven A. Morelli in 20-16, FILED. [2743735] [20-16, 19-4246] [Entered: 01/03/2020 07:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less