This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:52 (UTC).

Douglas Young v. USA

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Douglas Young filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12732

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

DOUGLAS YOUNG

Coleman, FL 33521-1032

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Douglas Young

Attorney at FCI Coleman Medium - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 1032

Coleman, FL 33521-1032

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Stephen Schlessinger

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Stephen Schlessinger for USA Ariana Fajardo Orshan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12732] (ECF: Stephen Schlessinger) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:56 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [19-12732] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:18 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Douglas Young failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 08/20/2019 03:13 PM]

Open Document #5

HAB-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Douglas Young was filed on 05/28/2019. Docket Entry 8. [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:56 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen Schlessinger for USA [19-12732] (ECF: Stephen Schlessinger) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:23 AM]

Open Document #2

DE #8 Order

Open Document #4

DE #12 Order

Open Document #3

DE #9 Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Douglas Young failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 08/20/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Stephen Schlessinger for USA Ariana Fajardo Orshan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12732] (ECF: Stephen Schlessinger) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen Schlessinger for USA [19-12732] (ECF: Stephen Schlessinger) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [19-12732] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Douglas Young was filed on 05/28/2019. Docket Entry 8. [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Douglas Young on 07/15/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.