This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/24/2020 at 06:04:22 (UTC).

Douglas Smith, et al v. Teamsters Local 2010, et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 Douglas Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Teamsters Local 2010. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-56503

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

ADAM DAY, in his official capacity as Chairman of the Board of Trustees of The California State University

Defendant / Appellees

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

BETTY YEE, in her official capacity as State Controller of California

TEAMSTERS LOCAL 2010, a labor organization

Plaintiff / Appellants

PAUL HOMSTAD

DOUGLAS SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Maureen C. Onyeagbako

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Andrew H. Baker

Attorney at Beeson, Tayer & Bodine

483 Ninth Street, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94607

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mariah Gondeiro Esquire

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Karin Sweigart

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Shella Sadovnik

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Robert Alan Bouvatte Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#4

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#10) Streamlined request [9] by Appellants Paul Homstad and Douglas Smith to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamline requests allow for 30 day extensions. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Paul Homstad and Douglas Smith opening brief due 03/23/2020. Appellees Xavier Becerra, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Teamsters Local 2010 and Betty Yee answering brief due 04/22/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11600931] (DLM) [Entered: 02/18/2020 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Paul Homstad and Douglas Smith. New requested due date is 03/20/2020. [11600695] [19-56503] (Sadovnik, Shella) [Entered: 02/18/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney Shella Sadovnik for Appellants Paul Homstad and Douglas Smith, in case 19-56503. [11600638] (HH) [Entered: 02/18/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Shella Sadovnik (Freedom Foundation, PO Box 552, Olympia, WA 98507) for Appellants Paul Homstad and Douglas Smith. Date of service: 02/08/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11600620] [19-56503] (Sadovnik, Shella) [Entered: 02/18/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11571246] (VS) [Entered: 01/23/2020 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/02/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11549053]. [19-56503] (AD) [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Paul Homstad and Douglas Smith Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/02/2020. [11549002] [19-56503] (Bouvatte, Robert) [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Robert Alan Bouvatte Jr. for party(s) Appellant Paul Homstad Appellant Douglas Smith, in case 19-56503. [11548862] (CW) [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert Alan Bouvatte, Jr. (Freedom Foundation, P.O. Box 552, Olympia, WA 98507) for Appellants Douglas Smith and Paul Homstad. Date of service: 01/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11548816] [19-56503] (Bouvatte, Robert) [Entered: 01/02/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Paul Homstad and Douglas Smith Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/02/2020. Appellants Paul Homstad and Douglas Smith opening brief due 02/21/2020. Appellees Xavier Becerra, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Teamsters Local 2010 and Betty Yee answering brief due 03/23/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11543970] (RT) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Alan Bouvatte, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shella Sadovnik

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karin Sweigart