This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/29/2021 at 06:43:12 (UTC).

Douglas Leke v. Russell Hott

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Douglas Leke filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Russell Hott. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-6681

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOUGLAS LEKE

Respondents

RUSSELL HOTT, in his official capacity as Washington Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

JEFFREY CRAWFORD, in his official capacity as superintendent, ICA-Farmville

MERRICK B. GARLAND, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg

Attorney at LEGAL AID JUSTICE CENTER

6066 Leesburg Pike

Falls Church, VA 22041

Irina Manelis

Attorney at MANELIS LAW, PLLC

4860 Cox Road

Glen Allen, VA 23060

Respondent Attorneys

Hugham Chan

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314-5194

Sarah Stevens Wilson

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Ben Franklin Station, P. O. Box 878

Washington, DC 20044-0878

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-01382-TSE-IDD. [21-6681] DL [Entered: 06/22/2021 08:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER filed dismissing appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [10]; administratively terminating Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties. [1000972372] [21-6681] DL [Entered: 06/22/2021 08:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Russell Hott and Merrick B. Garland to notice requesting response [ # 8 ]. [21-6681] Sarah Wilson [Entered: 06/21/2021 06:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE ISSUED to Merrick B. Garland and Russell Hott requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 7 ]Response due 06/21/2021.[1000966236].. [21-6681] KH [Entered: 06/09/2021 10:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Douglas Leke to dismiss appeal [7]. Date and method of service: 06/08/2021 ecf. [1000965953] [21-6681] Simon Sandoval-Moshenberg [Entered: 06/08/2021 09:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Merrick B. Garland and Russell Hott. [21-6681] Sarah Wilson [Entered: 06/07/2021 07:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sarah Stevens Wilson for Merrick B. Garland and Russell Hott. [1000964988] [21-6681] Sarah Wilson [Entered: 06/07/2021 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Hugham Chan for Russell Hott and Merrick B. Garland. [1000964445] [21-6681] Hugham Chan [Entered: 06/07/2021 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Merrick B. Garland and Russell Hott re: filing of appearance form, filing of docketing statement. Appearance form due on 06/07/2021 from Hugham Chan. Docketing statement due from Merrick B. Garland and Russell Hott on 06/07/2021. [21-6681] KH [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Simon Sandoval-Moshenberg for Douglas Leke. [1000944761] [21-6681] Simon Sandoval-Moshenberg [Entered: 05/03/2021 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1000943826-2 ] habeas immigration case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-01382-TSE-IDD. [21-6681] KH [Entered: 04/30/2021 02:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHabeas corpus immigration case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-01382-TSE-IDD. Date notice of appeal filed: 04/23/2021. Case manager: KHancock. [21-6681] KH [Entered: 04/30/2021 02:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Stevens Wilson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hugham Chan