This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2019 at 06:05:03 (UTC).

Douglas Baker, et al v. CMH Homes, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Douglas Baker filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CMH Homes, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35863

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

MARIA KAY DUPUIS-BAKER, as a married couple

DOUGLAS R. BAKER

Defendant / Appellant

CMH HOMES, INC., a Tennessee Corporation, DBA Clayton Homes #742

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Katie J. Comstock

Attorney at Levy Von Beck Comstock P.S.

1200 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1850

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Tamara K. Nelson

Attorney at Merrick, Hofstedt & Lindsey, P.S.

3101 Western Avenue

Seattle, WA 98121

W. Scott Simpson

Attorney at Simpson, McMahan, Glick & Burford, PLLC

2700 Hwy 280, Suite 203W

Birmingham, AL 35223

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Mediation Letter

#9

(#9) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 01/18/2020. :Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. opening brief due 03/27/2020. Appellees Douglas R. Baker and Maria Kay DuPuis-Baker answering brief due 04/27/2020Appellants optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [11527383] (LW) [Entered: 12/10/2019 01:38 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Counsel Case Information Packet

#8

(#8) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 12/06/2019. See order for details. [11509330] (LW) [Entered: 11/22/2019 02:43 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 11/22/2019. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows :Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. opening brief due 01/08/2020. Appellees Douglas R. Baker and Maria Kay DuPuis-Baker answering brief due 02/07/2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [11496609] (LW) [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:01 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 11/12/2019, 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11473473] (LW) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:41 PM]

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/21/2019. [11471398] [19-35863] (Nelson, Tamara) [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:27 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 01/18/2020. :Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. opening brief due 03/27/2020. Appellees Douglas R. Baker and Maria Kay DuPuis-Baker answering brief due 04/27/2020Appellants optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [11527383] (LW) [Entered: 12/10/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 12/06/2019. See order for details. [11509330] (LW) [Entered: 11/22/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 11/22/2019. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows :Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. opening brief due 01/08/2020. Appellees Douglas R. Baker and Maria Kay DuPuis-Baker answering brief due 02/07/2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [11496609] (LW) [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 11/12/2019, 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11473473] (LW) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11472187][19-35863] (AD) [Entered: 10/21/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/21/2019. [11471398] [19-35863] (Nelson, Tamara) [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • (#3) Added Attorney(s) W. Scott Simpson for party(s) Appellant CMH Homes, Inc.. [11469753] (RL) [Entered: 10/18/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Wayne Scott Simpson (Simpson, McMahan, Glick & Burford, PLLC) for Appellant CMH Homes, Inc.. Date of service: 10/18/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11469671] [19-35863] (Simpson, W.) [Entered: 10/18/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/22/2019. Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. opening brief due 12/13/2019. Appellees Douglas R. Baker and Maria Kay DuPuis-Baker answering brief due 01/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11464086] (HC) [Entered: 10/15/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.