Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/27/2019 at 06:09:10 (UTC).

Doris Keating v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Doris Keating filed an Other lawsuit against U S Bank Trust, N A. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1269

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

DORIS KEATING

Debtor

In re: DORIS KEATING

Appellee

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Richard Lawrence Antognini Esquire

Attorney at Law Office of Richard L. Antognini

2036 Nevada City Highway

Grass Valley, CA 95945

Appellee Attorneys

JaVonne M. Phillips Esquire

Attorney at McCarthy & Holthus, LLP

411 Ivy Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Kelly M. Raftery

Attorney at McCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP

411 Ivy Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Matthew Bryan Learned Esquire

Attorney at McCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP

411 Ivy Street

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Filed order (GAN and SPRAKER); The motion for stay pending appeal is ORDERED DENIED.; ( see attached order) (VJ) [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:41 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed (ECF) Attorney Matthew Bryan Learned, Esquire for Appellee U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.'s response opposing motion (staying further action, staying further action).; served on 12/02/2019 email - Attorney for Appellant: Antognini; Attorney for Appellee: Learned. [19-1269] (MBL) [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:26 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew B. Learned for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust; served on 12/02/2019 email - Attorney for Appellant: Antognini; Attorney for Appellees: Phillips, Raftery. [19-1269] (MBL) [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:14 PM]

8 #3

Ex 4 15 combined files_Part 3

8 #2

Ex 4 15 combined files_Part 2

8 #1

Exhibit 4 to motion for stay on appeal-part 1

7 #30

Ex 29

7 #29

Ex 28

7 #17

Ex 16

7 #16

Ex 15

7 #15

Ex 14

7 #14

Ex 13

7 #13

Ex 12

7 #12

Ex 11

7 #11

Ex 10

7 #10

Ex 9

7 #9

Ex 8

7 #8

Ex 7

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Filed order (GAN and SPRAKER); The motion for stay pending appeal is ORDERED DENIED.; ( see attached order) (VJ) [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Filed (ECF) Attorney Matthew Bryan Learned, Esquire for Appellee U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.'s response opposing motion (staying further action, staying further action).; served on 12/02/2019 email - Attorney for Appellant: Antognini; Attorney for Appellee: Learned. [19-1269] (MBL) [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • (#11) Terminate from case: Attorney JaVonne M. Phillips for Appellee U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. in 19-1269, Attorney Kelly M. Raftery for Appellee U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. in 19-1269 (VJ) [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • (#10) Party: Add Attorney(s) Matthew Bryan Learned for party(s) Appellee U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., in case 19-1269. (VJ) [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew B. Learned for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust; served on 12/02/2019 email - Attorney for Appellant: Antognini; Attorney for Appellees: Phillips, Raftery. [19-1269] (MBL) [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Richard Lawrence Antognini, Esquire for Appellant Doris Keating's Emergency motion to stay further action pending appeal; 12/02/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellant: Antognini; Attorney for Appellees: Phillips, Raftery; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Phillips, Raftery. [19-1269] (RLA) [Entered: 12/02/2019 04:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Richard Lawrence Antognini, Esquire for Appellant Doris Keating's Emergency motion to stay further action pending appeal; 12/02/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellant: Antognini; Attorney for Appellees: Phillips, Raftery; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Phillips, Raftery. [19-1269] (RLA) [Entered: 12/02/2019 04:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • (#6) Docketing error.--[Edited 11/14/2019 by PI] (PI) [Entered: 11/14/2019 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Sent Notice of Mandatory Attorney Electronic Filing form to Attorney JaVonne M. Phillips, Esquire for Appellee U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. with note that paper filings will not be accepted. (PI) [Entered: 11/14/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of order filed in Bk. Ct. 10/28/2019. (PI) [Entered: 11/08/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER to appellant Doris Keating. Copies to all parties. Appellant Doris Keating's opening brief due 12/23/2019. (PI) [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of notice of referral filed in Bk. Ct. 10/25/2019. (PI) [Entered: 11/06/2019 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 10/25/2019, and copy of order. (PI) [Entered: 11/06/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B. Learned Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JaVonne M Phillips