This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2020 at 06:07:39 (UTC).

Dorin Trofin v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Dorin Trofin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-14932

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DORIN TROFIN

Defendant / Appellee

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Joshua D. Molandes

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

12800 University Dr Ste 600

Fort Myers, FL 33907-5349

Jason Rafael Leonard

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

333 W Vine St Ste 1200

Lexington, KY 40601

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David Wood Grossman

Attorney at Simon Reed & Salazar, PA

9130 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1209

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Amended Motion [ # 8989068-2 ] filed by Appellant Dorin Trofin. [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/24/2020 05:13 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Joshua D. Molandes for Appellant Dorin Trofin. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/24/2020 01:08 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Dorin Trofin. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8989068-1] [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/22/2020 06:15 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Wood Grossman for Appellee Costco Wholesale Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14932] (ECF: David Grossman) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:03 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Joshua D. Molandes for Appellant Dorin Trofin. [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:38 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua D. Molandes for Dorin Trofin. [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:36 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Dorin Trofin failed to file a Transcript Order Form within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 01/09/2020 10:23 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Wood Grossman for Appellee Costco Wholesale Corporation. [19-14932] (ECF: David Grossman) [Entered: 01/07/2020 09:26 AM]

Open Document

Jason Rafael Leonard for Appellant Dorin Trofin and Joshua D. Molandes for Appellant Dorin Trofin has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:18 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Wood Grossman for Costco Wholesale Corporation. [19-14932] (ECF: David Grossman) [Entered: 12/26/2019 12:01 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Judgment- Doc #79

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Motion [ # 8989068-2 ] filed by Appellant Dorin Trofin. [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/24/2020 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Joshua D. Molandes for Appellant Dorin Trofin. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/24/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of deficiency, Motion to reinstate does not have a transcript order form attached filed by Joshua D. Molandes for Dorin Trofin. Counsel must file a corrected motion using the Amend, Correct or Supplement Motion event within 3 days. [Entered: 01/23/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of deficient Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Joshua D. Molandes for Dorin Trofin. Document Not Legible/Complete. [Entered: 01/23/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Dorin Trofin. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8989068-1] [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/22/2020 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketYour appeal is presently closed. [Entered: 01/22/2020 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Wood Grossman for Appellee Costco Wholesale Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14932] (ECF: David Grossman) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Joshua D. Molandes for Appellant Dorin Trofin. [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua D. Molandes for Dorin Trofin. [19-14932] (ECF: Joshua Molandes) [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Dorin Trofin failed to file a Transcript Order Form within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 01/09/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to David Wood Grossman for Costco Wholesale Corporation. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 01/09/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Wood Grossman for Appellee Costco Wholesale Corporation. [19-14932] (ECF: David Grossman) [Entered: 01/07/2020 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJason Rafael Leonard for Appellant Dorin Trofin and Joshua D. Molandes for Appellant Dorin Trofin has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jason Rafael Leonard for Dorin Trofin and Joshua D. Molandes for Dorin Trofin. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketAppellate fees received $505 receipt number FtM014303 was paid on 01/02/2020 as to Appellant Dorin Trofin. [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Wood Grossman for Costco Wholesale Corporation. [19-14932] (ECF: David Grossman) [Entered: 12/26/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Dorin Trofin on 12/09/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/24/2019 as to Appellant Dorin Trofin. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/07/2020 as to Appellee Costco Wholesale Corporation [Entered: 12/13/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Wood Grossman