This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2021 at 06:12:34 (UTC).

Dori Yates, et al v. Hillsboro Unified School Dist., et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 Dori Yates filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hillsboro Unified School Dist . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-36080

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HILLSBORO CLASSIFIED UNITED AFT LOCAL 4671

AFT OREGON

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO

HILLSBORO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, a public school district

Plaintiff / Appellants

DORI YATES

TONYA SEVILLA

CLAUDIA STRICKLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stefanie Wilson

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Scott A. Kronland

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Matthew John Murray

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Peter R. Mersereau

Attorney at Mersereau Shannon LLP

111 Sw Columbia Street, Suite 1100

Portland, OR 97201

Blake H. Fry

Attorney at Hart Wagner, LLP

111 Sw Columbia Street, Suite 1100

Portland, OR 97201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James G. Abernathy

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Rebekah Millard

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11962769] (LW) [Entered: 01/13/2021 03:31 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 01/12/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11948063] (LW) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:56 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Dori Yates, Claudia Strickland and Tonya Sevilla Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/24/2020. [11944861] [20-36080] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 12/24/2020 10:31 AM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11962769] (LW) [Entered: 01/13/2021 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 01/12/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11948063] (LW) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/24/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11944993]. [20-36080] (AD) [Entered: 12/24/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Dori Yates, Claudia Strickland and Tonya Sevilla Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/24/2020. [11944861] [20-36080] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 12/24/2020 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Tonya Sevilla, Claudia Strickland and Dori Yates Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/24/2020. Appellants Tonya Sevilla, Claudia Strickland and Dori Yates opening brief due 02/16/2021. Appellees AFT Oregon, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, Hillsboro Classified United AFT Local 4671 and Hillsboro Unified School District answering brief due 03/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11930920] (JBS) [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebekah Millard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James G. Abernathy