This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 07:13:15 (UTC).

Dora Lee, et al v. Postmates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Dora Lee filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Postmates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15024

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSHUA ALBERT, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Plaintiff / Appellants

KELLYN TIMMERMAN

DORA LEE

Defendant / Appellee

POSTMATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Shannon Liss-Riordan Esquire

Attorney at Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.

729 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Theane Evangelis

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Peter C. Squeri

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Michele L. Maryott Esquire

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Dhananjay Manthripragada

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The assessment conference previously scheduled for January 28, 2019, is canceled. This appeal is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11156010] (BS) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:25 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/28/2019, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11154183] (BS) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:30 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Dora Lee and Kellyn Timmerman Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/08/2019. [11144329] [19-15024] (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Entered: 01/08/2019 07:14 AM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The assessment conference previously scheduled for January 28, 2019, is canceled. This appeal is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11156010] (BS) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/28/2019, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11154183] (BS) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/08/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11145338] (AD) [Entered: 01/08/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Dora Lee and Kellyn Timmerman Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/08/2019. [11144329] [19-15024] (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Entered: 01/08/2019 07:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/04/2019. Transcript due 03/05/2019. Appellants Dora Lee and Kellyn Timmerman opening brief due 04/15/2019. Appellee Postmates, Inc. answering brief due 05/14/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11141959] (JBS) [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POSTMATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter C. Squeri

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theane Evangelis