This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 06:09:56 (UTC).

Donna Reed v. Scientific Games Corp.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Donna Reed filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Scientific Games Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35482

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

SCIENTIFIC GAMES CORPORATION, a Nevada corporation

Plaintiff / Appellee

DONNA REED, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Adam L. Hoeflich

Attorney at Bartlit Beck, LLP

54 W Hubbard Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Sean C. Grimsley

Attorney at Bartlit Beck, LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

David T. Martin

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 3Rd Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Nicola Menaldo Esquire

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 3Rd Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Kathleen M. O'Sullivan Esquire

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 3Rd Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Daniel Taylor

Attorney at Bartlit Beck, LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Alison Wheeler

Attorney at Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Rafey S. Balabanian

Attorney at Edelson PC

150 California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alexander Glenn Tievsky

Attorney at Edelson P.C.

350 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60654

Cecily Shiel

Attorney at Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC

1700 Seventh Avenue, Suite 2200

Seattle, WA 98101

Ryan D. Andrews

Attorney at Edelson P.C.

350 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60654

Todd Logan

Attorney at Edelson PC

150 California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Roger J. Perlstadt

Attorney at Edelson P.C.

350 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60654

Cecily Jordan

Attorney at Tousley Brain Stephens, PLLC

1200 5Th Avenue, Suite 1700

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#16

#18

#19

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [12175151] (LW) [Entered: 07/16/2021 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/16/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12163623] (LW) [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#17) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/29/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12157613]. [21-35482] (AD) [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellant Scientific Games Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/29/2021. [12157482] [21-35482] (Hoeflich, Adam) [Entered: 06/29/2021 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#15) Added Attorney(s) David T. Martin, Kathleen M. O'Sullivan for party(s) Appellant Scientific Games Corporation, in case 21-35482. [12154048] (NAC) [Entered: 06/24/2021 10:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#14) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David T. Martin (Perkins Coie LLP, 1201 Third Avenue, Seattle, WA 98101) for Appellant Scientific Games Corporation. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153987] [21-35482] (Martin, David) [Entered: 06/24/2021 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kathleen M. O'Sullivan (Perkins Coie LLP, 1201 Third Avenue, Seattle, WA 98101) for Appellant Scientific Games Corporation. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153984] [21-35482] (O'Sullivan, Kathleen) [Entered: 06/24/2021 05:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#12) Added Attorney(s) Adam L. Hoeflich, Alison Wheeler for party(s) Appellant Scientific Games Corporation, in case 21-35482. [12153630] (NAC) [Entered: 06/24/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alison G. Wheeler (Bartlit Beck LLP, 1801 Wewatta Street, 12th Floor, Denver, CO 80202) for Appellant Scientific Games Corporation. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153625] [21-35482] (Wheeler, Alison) [Entered: 06/24/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam L. Hoeflich (Bartlit Beck LLP, 54 W. Hubbard St., Ste. 300, Chicago, IL 60654) for Appellant Scientific Games Corporation. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153614] [21-35482] (Hoeflich, Adam) [Entered: 06/24/2021 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Daniel Taylor for party(s) Appellant Scientific Games Corporation, in case 21-35482. [12153511] (NAC) [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel C. Taylor (Bartlit Beck LLP, 1801 Wewatta Street, 12th Floor, Denver, CO 80202) for Appellant Scientific Games Corporation. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153507] [21-35482] (Taylor, Daniel) [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Sean C. Grimsley for party(s) Appellant Scientific Games Corporation, in case 21-35482. [12153505] (NAC) [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sean C. Grimsley (Bartlit Beck LLP, 1801 Wewatta Street, 12th Floor, Denver, CO 80202) for Appellant Scientific Games Corporation. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153497] [21-35482] (Grimsley, Sean) [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Roger J. Perlstadt for party(s) Appellee Donna Reed, in case 21-35482. [12153244] (NAC) [Entered: 06/24/2021 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Roger Perlstadt (Edelson PC, 350 North LaSalle Street, 14th Floor, Chicago, Illinois 60654) for Appellee Donna Reed. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153235] [21-35482] (Perlstadt, Roger) [Entered: 06/24/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Ryan D. Andrews for party(s) Appellee Donna Reed, in case 21-35482. [12153231] (NAC) [Entered: 06/24/2021 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ryan D. Andrews (Edelson PC, 350 North LaSalle Street, 14th Floor, Chicago, Illinois 60654) for Appellee Donna Reed. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153225] [21-35482] (Andrews, Ryan) [Entered: 06/24/2021 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Scientific Games Corporation Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/30/2021. Transcript ordered by 07/23/2021. Transcript due 08/23/2021. Appellant Scientific Games Corporation opening brief due 10/01/2021. Appellee Donna Reed answering brief due 11/01/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12152451] (JBS) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scientific Games Corporation Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Glenn Tievsky

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Logan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger Perlstadt