This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/03/2022 at 06:28:00 (UTC).

Donald Wagda, et al v. AT&T Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 Donald Wagda, filed an Other lawsuit against AT T Corp ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16173

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff / Appellant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, EX REL. DONALD WAGDA

Danville, CA 94506

Defendant / Appellees

AT&T CORP.

AT&T MOBILITY, LLC

AT&T MOBILITY II LLC

AT&T SERVICES, INC.

DIRECTV, LLC

NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS, LLC

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Colleen M. Kennedy

Attorney at USSAC - Office of the US Attorney

501 I Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Donald Wagda

547 Blackhawk Club Drive

Danville, CA 94506

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Todd A. Pickles Esquire

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1201 K Street, Suite 1100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Karin Bohmholdt

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1840 Century Park, E, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Carolyn Fitzhugh McNiven

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

101 2Nd Street, Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Hannah Beth Shanks-Parkin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1840 Century Park, E, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Donald Wagda Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/08/2022. [12512625] [22-16173] (Wagda, Donald) [Entered: 08/08/2022 11:49 PM]

#11

(#11) Filed order MEDIATION (JW):The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in that pilot project. By September 12, 2022, the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or in the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (Jonathan_Westen@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Jonathan Westen, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12523142] (JBS) [Entered: 08/22/2022 03:52 PM]

12 #1

Main Document

12 #2

Additional Document

#13

(#13) Filed order MEDIATION (BS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Participants with an email address on the attached list will receive an email with dial-in information. If an email address is not listed or if there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Participants may also leave a message at (415) 355-7900 to request dial-in information. Finally, please notify Circuit Mediator Jonathan Westen immediately by email (Jonathan_Westen@ca9.uscourts.gov) if a participant has an unavoidable scheduling conflict. Please copy all participants on any such communications. All emails should include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. All written or spoken communication with the mediator, including the discussions during the scheduled conference, are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. Additional information about confidentiality (including a copy of Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1), the assessment conference, and the Mediation Program are attached and can also be found at the Mediation Program website (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due October 18, 2022; appellees' answering brief is due November 18, 2022; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) [12553303] (WL) [Entered: 09/30/2022 10:56 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed order MEDIATION (BS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Participants with an email address on the attached list will receive an email with dial-in information. If an email address is not listed or if there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Participants may also leave a message at (415) 355-7900 to request dial-in information. Finally, please notify Circuit Mediator Jonathan Westen immediately by email (Jonathan_Westen@ca9.uscourts.gov) if a participant has an unavoidable scheduling conflict. Please copy all participants on any such communications. All emails should include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. All written or spoken communication with the mediator, including the discussions during the scheduled conference, are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. Additional information about confidentiality (including a copy of Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1), the assessment conference, and the Mediation Program are attached and can also be found at the Mediation Program website (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due October 18, 2022; appellees' answering brief is due November 18, 2022; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) [12553303] (WL) [Entered: 09/30/2022 10:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellant Donald Wagda Correspondence: Appellant's Notice of Filing of Notice of Present Intent Not To Order Transcripts. Date of service: 09/06/2022 [12534072] [22-16173] (Wagda, Donald) [Entered: 09/06/2022 01:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed order MEDIATION (JW):The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in that pilot project. By September 12, 2022, the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or in the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (Jonathan_Westen@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Jonathan Westen, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12523142] (JBS) [Entered: 08/22/2022 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Hannah Beth Shanks-Parkin for party(s) Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC Appellee New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC Appellee AT&T Services, Inc. Appellee Pacific Bell Telephone Company Appellee AT&T Corp. Appellee AT&T Mobility II LLC Appellee DIRECTV, LLC, in case 22-16173. [12513468] (QDL) [Entered: 08/09/2022 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Hannah B. Shanks-Parkin (Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1840 Century Park East, Suite 1900, Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellees AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC and Pacific Bell Telephone Company. Date of service: 08/09/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12513429] [22-16173] (Shanks-Parkin, Hannah) [Entered: 08/09/2022 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Karin Bohmholdt for party(s) Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC Appellee New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC Appellee AT&T Services, Inc. Appellee Pacific Bell Telephone Company Appellee AT&T Corp. Appellee AT&T Mobility II LLC Appellee DIRECTV, LLC, in case 22-16173. [12513417] (QDL) [Entered: 08/09/2022 03:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Karin L. Bohmholdt (Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1840 Century Park East, Suite 1900, Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellees AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC and Pacific Bell Telephone Company. Date of service: 08/09/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12513415] [22-16173] (Bohmholdt, Karin) [Entered: 08/09/2022 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Carolyn Fitzhugh McNiven for party(s) Appellee AT&T Mobility, LLC Appellee New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC Appellee AT&T Services, Inc. Appellee Pacific Bell Telephone Company Appellee AT&T Corp. Appellee AT&T Mobility II LLC Appellee DIRECTV, LLC, in case 22-16173. [12513380] (QDL) [Entered: 08/09/2022 02:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Carolyn F. McNiven (Greenberg Traurig, LLP 101 Second Street, Suite 2200, San Francisco, CA 94105) for Appellees AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC and Pacific Bell Telephone Company. Date of service: 08/09/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12513374] [22-16173] (McNiven, Carolyn) [Entered: 08/09/2022 02:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/08/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12512637]. [22-16173] (AD) [Entered: 08/09/2022 06:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Donald Wagda Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/08/2022. [12512625] [22-16173] (Wagda, Donald) [Entered: 08/08/2022 11:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Docket(#2) Terminated Carolyn Fitzhugh McNiven for Pacific Bell Telephone Company, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, DIRECTV, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Mobility II LLC and AT&T Corp. in 22-16173 [12509850] (RT) [Entered: 08/04/2022 03:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Donald Wagda opening brief due 10/04/2022. Appellees AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, Pacific Bell Telephone Company and United States of America answering brief due 11/04/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12509840] (RT) [Entered: 08/04/2022 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Cingular Wireless Pcs, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility is a litigant

Latest cases where DIRECTV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Services Inc is a litigant