This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/10/2020 at 06:06:28 (UTC).

Donald Tucker v. Marquette County, MI, et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Donald Tucker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Marquette County, MI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1878

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DONALD SCOTT TUCKER, Personal Representative of the Estate of Clifford Tucker

Defendant / Appellees

MARQUETTE COUNTY, MI

KEITH ROMBACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Hugh M. Davis

Attorney at Constitutional Litigation Associates

220 Bagley Street, Suite 740

Detroit, MI 48226

Scott Matthew Mackela

Attorney at Law Office

P.O. Box 289

Lake Orion, MI 48362

Cynthia Heenan

Attorney at Constitutional Litigation Associates

220 Bagley Street, Suite 740

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer Anne Richards

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho

17436 College Parkway

Livonia, MI 48152

Haider A. Kazim

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho

310 W. Front Street, Suite 221

Traverse City, MI 49684

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/18/2020. appellee brief now due 12/18/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:34 AM]

#11

(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Cynthia Heenan for Appellant Donald Scott Tucker.. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1878] (CH) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:36 PM]

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Cynthia Heenan for Appellant Donald Scott Tucker Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1878] (CH) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:35 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Donald Scott Tucker by Hugh M. Davis. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1878] (HMD) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:32 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Donald Scott Tucker by Cynthia Heenan. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1878] (CH) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:30 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/05/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/14/2020 02:00 PM]

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Jennifer Anne Richards for Appellees Marquette County, MI and Keith Romback Certificate of Service: 09/11/2020. [20-1878] (JAR) [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:42 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Marquette County, MI and Keith Romback by Jennifer A. Richards. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2020. [20-1878] (JAR) [Entered: 09/11/2020 12:13 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/21/2020; appellee brief due 11/20/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 10:16 AM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Donald Scott Tucker. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 10:13 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#13) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/18/2020. appellee brief now due 12/18/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Cynthia Heenan for Appellant Donald Scott Tucker.. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1878] (CH) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Cynthia Heenan for Appellant Donald Scott Tucker Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1878] (CH) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Donald Scott Tucker by Hugh M. Davis. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1878] (HMD) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Donald Scott Tucker by Cynthia Heenan. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1878] (CH) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/05/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/14/2020 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#6) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/14/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Jennifer Anne Richards for Appellees Marquette County, MI and Keith Romback Certificate of Service: 09/11/2020. [20-1878] (JAR) [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Marquette County, MI and Keith Romback by Jennifer A. Richards. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2020. [20-1878] (JAR) [Entered: 09/11/2020 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/21/2020; appellee brief due 11/20/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Donald Scott Tucker. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARQUETTE COUNTY, MI is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Haider A. Kazim

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Anne Richards