This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 06:05:41 (UTC).

Donald Trump, et al v. Mazars USA, LLP

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Donald Trump filed an Other lawsuit against Mazars USA, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5142

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Trump Organization, Inc.

Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust

Trump Old Post Office LLC

Trump Corporation

Donald J. Trump

DJT Holdings, LLC

Trump Organization, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

Mazars USA, LLP

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee

Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives

Amicus Curiae

Duane Morley Cox

Logan, UT 84321

Constitutional Accountability Center

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stefan Charles Passantino

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich, LLP

1000 Maine Avenue, Sw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20024

William Spencer Consovoy

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

1600 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

Cameron Thomas Norris

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

1600 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jerry Daniel Bernstein

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

405 Lexington Avenue

New York City, NY 10174

Henry Federick Schuelke III

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Lawrence H. Wechsler

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jerry Daniel Bernstein Esquire

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1271 Avenue Of Americas

New York, NY 10020

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Megan Barbero Esquire

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Todd B. Tatelman

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Josephine Thacher Morse

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Brooks M. Hanner

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Douglas N. Letter

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Duane Morley Cox

1199 Cliffside Drive

Logan, UT 84321

Elizabeth B. Wydra

Attorney at Constitutional Accountability Center

1200 18Th Street, Nw, Suite 501

Washington, DC 20036

Ashwin Pradyumna Phatak

Attorney at Constitutional Accountability Center

1200 18Th Street, Nw, Suite 501

Washington, DC 20036

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Proposed Responsive Letter

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

Open Document

LETTER [1797542] regarding oral argument matter [Response to Questions as Directed by the Court at Oral Argument] filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 07/16/2019 ] [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:04 PM]

Open Document

ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 07/12/2019 09:38 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1796602] sent regarding 7/12/19 public advisory. [19-5142] [Entered: 07/10/2019 12:41 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1796503] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 07/09/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,468 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 07/09/2019 08:16 PM]

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER [1795668] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 30 Minutes, Appellee Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives - 30 Minutes; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 07/05/2019 [19-5142] [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:36 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1795361] advising that a brief will not be filed filed by Mazars USA, LLP [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] [19-5142] (Bernstein, Jerry) [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:39 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1791954] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,799 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:58 PM]

Open Document

JOINT APPENDIX [1791951] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 05/22/2019 ] [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:52 PM]

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER [1791939] filed granting motion of Duane Morley Cox to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1791158-2 ]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged amicus brief [ # 1791159-2 ] Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:18 PM]

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER [1789247] filed considering motion to expedite case [ # 1789081-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/10/2019. APPENDIX due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/01/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/09/2019, scheduling oral argument on Friday, 07/12/2019. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:49 PM]

Open Document

JOINT MOTION [1789081] to expedite case filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (Service Date: 05/22/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 281 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:15 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788738] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01136-APM filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc. and Trump Organization, LLC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5142. [19-5142] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:18 PM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1798189] for leave to file letter filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (Service Date: 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 202 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 07/19/2019 07:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1797542] regarding oral argument matter [Response to Questions as Directed by the Court at Oral Argument] filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 07/16/2019 ] [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1797054] ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that the United States Department of Justice be invited to file a brief amicus curiae, not to exceed 5,200 words, by 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 6, 2019, expressing the views of the United States on this case. The parties may file responses, not to exceed 3,000 words each, by 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 20, 2019. Absent extraordinary circumstances, because of the expedited nature of the proceedings, no extensions of time will be granted by the court. In addition to electronic filing, paper copies of the submissions must be delivered to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 07/15/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 07/12/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1796602] sent regarding 7/12/19 public advisory. [19-5142] [Entered: 07/10/2019 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1796503] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 07/09/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,468 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 07/09/2019 08:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, William S. Consovoy, on behalf of Appellants DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 07/03/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Douglas N. Letter, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 07/03/2019 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1795668] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 30 Minutes, Appellee Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives - 30 Minutes; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 07/05/2019 [19-5142] [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1795361] advising that a brief will not be filed filed by Mazars USA, LLP [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] [19-5142] (Bernstein, Jerry) [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1791954] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,799 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT APPENDIX [1791951] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 05/22/2019 ] [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [ # 1791159-2 ] is filed [19-5142] [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1791939] filed granting motion of Duane Morley Cox to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1791158-2 ]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged amicus brief [ # 1791159-2 ] Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1791159] filed by Duane Morley Cox [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] Length of Brief: 24 pages. [19-5142] [Entered: 06/05/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1791158] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Duane Morley Cox [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] [19-5142] [Entered: 06/05/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1789247] filed considering motion to expedite case [ # 1789081-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/10/2019. APPENDIX due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/01/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/09/2019, scheduling oral argument on Friday, 07/12/2019. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT MOTION [1789081] to expedite case filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (Service Date: 05/22/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 281 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788738] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01136-APM filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc. and Trump Organization, LLC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5142. [19-5142] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5142] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.