This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/23/2019 at 06:03:31 (UTC).

Donald Shooter v. State of Arizona, et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Donald Shooter filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Arizona. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16248

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JAVAN MESNARD, Named as Javan "J.D." Mesnard, Husband

STATE OF ARIZONA

HOLLY MESNARD, Wife

JANAE ADAMS, Wife

KIRK ADAMS, Husband

Plaintiff / Appellant

DONALD SHOOTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stephen William Tully Esquire

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

2375 E. Camelback Road, Suite 750

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Bradley Dunn

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

2375 E. Camelback Road, Suite 750

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Jeremy Horn

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Stephanie S. Elliott

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Michael Tryon

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Ronald Jay Cohen

Attorney at Cohen Kennedy Dowd & Quigley, P.C.

2425 East Camelback Rd.

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Daniel P. Quigley Esquire

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Betsy J. Lamm

Attorney at Cohen Kennedy Dowd & Quigley, P.C.

2425 East Camelback Rd.

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Thomas Charles Horne Esquire

Attorney at Horne Slaton, PLLC

6720 N. Scottsdale Road, Suite 285

Scottsdale, AZ 85253

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Received copy of District Court order filed on 07/15/2019. [11375695] (JFF) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:52 PM]

#10

(#10) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ]) for an extension of time to make arrangements with the court reporter is granted. A review of the district court docket indicates that appellant ordered the transcripts on July 17, 2019. The transcripts are now due August 19, 2019. The opening brief is due September 30, 2019. The answering brief is due October 30, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The Clerk will send a copy of this order to the court reporter at the district court. [11368608] (OC) [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:49 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Donald Shooter Motion to extend the time to file appellant designation of reporters transcript until 09/30/2019. Date of service: 07/12/2019. [11362501] [19-16248] (Horne, Thomas) [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:47 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11356022] (VS) [Entered: 07/08/2019 09:44 AM]

5 #2

Attachment

5 #1

Main Document

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Donald Shooter Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/03/2019. [11353087] [19-16248] (Horne, Thomas) [Entered: 07/03/2019 08:28 AM]

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11351852] (LW) [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:18 AM]

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Received copy of District Court order filed on 07/15/2019. [11375695] (JFF) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ]) for an extension of time to make arrangements with the court reporter is granted. A review of the district court docket indicates that appellant ordered the transcripts on July 17, 2019. The transcripts are now due August 19, 2019. The opening brief is due September 30, 2019. The answering brief is due October 30, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The Clerk will send a copy of this order to the court reporter at the district court. [11368608] (OC) [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • (#9) Added Attorney(s) Michael Tryon for party(s) Appellee State of Arizona, in case 19-16248. [11368477] (JFF) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of G. Michael Tryon (Office of the Arizona Attorney General 2005 N. Central Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85004-1592) for Appellee State of Arizona. Date of service: 07/17/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11367182] [19-16248] (Tryon, Michael) [Entered: 07/17/2019 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Donald Shooter Motion to extend the time to file appellant designation of reporters transcript until 09/30/2019. Date of service: 07/12/2019. [11362501] [19-16248] (Horne, Thomas) [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11356022] (VS) [Entered: 07/08/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Appellees Kirk Adams and Janae Adams Correspondence: Appellee's Kirk and Janae Adams' Notice of Correction to Appellant's Statement of Representation. Date of service: 07/03/2019 [11354363] [19-16248] (Lamm, Betsy) [Entered: 07/03/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/03/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11353728][19-16248] (AD) [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Donald Shooter Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/03/2019. [11353087] [19-16248] (Horne, Thomas) [Entered: 07/03/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11351852] (LW) [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/01/2019. Transcript ordered by 07/22/2019. Transcript due 08/20/2019. Appellant Donald Shooter opening brief due 09/30/2019. Appellees Janae Adams, Kirk Adams, Holly Mesnard, Javan Mesnard and State of Arizona answering brief due 10/29/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11341901] (JMR) [Entered: 06/24/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas C Horne