This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/06/2022 at 06:18:25 (UTC).

Donald Kinsella v. Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 Donald Kinsella filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2007

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DONALD J. KINSELLA

Defendant / Appellees

BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS, LLC

BAKER HUGHES, A GE COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Timothy J. Coffey

Attorney at COFFEY LAW OFFICE, P.C.

118 N. Clinton Street

Chicago, IL 60187

Christopher Keleher

Attorney at KELEHER APPELLATE LAW GROUP, LLC

One E. Erie Street

Chicago, IL 60611

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David J. Rowland

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-6448

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7242229] [22-2007] (Coffey, Timothy) [Entered: 06/13/2022 06:42 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. [3] [7243675] [22-2007] (Coffey, Timothy) [Entered: 06/21/2022 04:28 PM]

#4

(#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom Tuesday, July 26, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [4] [7243887] [22-2007] (CG) [Entered: 06/22/2022 02:19 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/26/2022 for Donald J. Kinsella. Appellees' brief due on or before 09/27/2022 for Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC and Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/18/2022 for Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. JB [7243889] [22-2007] (CG) [Entered: 06/22/2022 02:23 PM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David J. Rowland for Appellees Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC and Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC. [6] [7245318] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2007] (Rowland, David) [Entered: 06/29/2022 08:32 PM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Christopher Keleher for Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. [7] [7245512] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2007]--[Edited 06/30/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Keleher, Christopher) [Entered: 06/30/2022 03:52 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/28/2022 for Donald J. Kinsella. Appellees' brief due on or before 12/16/2022 for Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC and Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/06/2023 for Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. JB [7251277] [22-2007] (HTP) [Entered: 07/28/2022 04:41 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/28/2022 for Donald J. Kinsella. Appellees' brief due on or before 12/16/2022 for Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC and Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/06/2023 for Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. JB [7251277] [22-2007] (HTP) [Entered: 07/28/2022 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Christopher Keleher for Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. [7] [7245512] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2007]--[Edited 06/30/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Keleher, Christopher) [Entered: 06/30/2022 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David J. Rowland for Appellees Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC and Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC. [6] [7245318] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2007] (Rowland, David) [Entered: 06/29/2022 08:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/26/2022 for Donald J. Kinsella. Appellees' brief due on or before 09/27/2022 for Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC and Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/18/2022 for Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. JB [7243889] [22-2007] (CG) [Entered: 06/22/2022 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom Tuesday, July 26, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [4] [7243887] [22-2007] (CG) [Entered: 06/22/2022 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. [3] [7243675] [22-2007] (Coffey, Timothy) [Entered: 06/21/2022 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Donald J. Kinsella. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7242229] [22-2007] (Coffey, Timothy) [Entered: 06/13/2022 06:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Donald J. Kinsella by 06/13/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 06/21/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/18/2022 for Donald J. Kinsella. [1] [7241160] [22-2007] (CG) [Entered: 06/08/2022 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED is a litigant