This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/21/2021 at 06:12:07 (UTC).

Donald Jackson v. Robert Carter, et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Donald Jackson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Robert Carter. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1711

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MS. SMITH

NEAL FETZ

KEITH BUTTS

GEO GROUP, INCORPORATED

ROBERT E. CARTER

Plaintiff / Appellant

DONALD L. JACKSON

New Castle, IN 47362-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Donald L. Jackson

Attorney at NEW CASTLE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

1000 Van Nuys Road, P.O. Box E

New Castle, IN 47362-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Aaron T. Craft

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

12 #2

Public Docket

12 #1

Order

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #2

PLRA Fee Notice AC

4 #1

PLRA D.C. Denial of IFP

#3

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/06/2021 for Donald L. Jackson. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/03/2021 for Robert E. Carter. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/24/2021 for Appellant Donald L. Jackson [15] [7164829] [21-1711] (CM) [Entered: 06/04/2021 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron T. Craft for Appellee Robert E. Carter. [14] [7164019] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1711]--[Edited 06/01/2021 by MM to correct type of filing and to reflect addition of counsel.]] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 06/01/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [13][7163714] [21-1711] (CM) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re: 1. Letter. 2. Motion for appointment of counsel. A review of the docket indicates that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). On May 17, 2021, this court denied the appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and ordered him to pay the $505.00 appellate fees. Because the appellant has not yet paid the $505.00 fees in the district court, IT IS ORDERED that the motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without court action, in light of the courts fee notice and order dated April 22, 2021. The clerk shall send the appellant a copy of the courts public docket. [ # 10 ] [ # 9 ] CMD [12] [7162720] [21-1711] (ZNS) [Entered: 05/25/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [11] [7162662] [21-1711] (MAN) [Entered: 05/25/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson to extend time to file IFP motion. [10] [7162661] [21-1711] (MAN) [Entered: 05/25/2021 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson for appointment of counsel with memorandum of law in support. [9] [7162620] [21-1711] (CAH) [Entered: 05/25/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7162281] [21-1711] (CM) [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re: 1)Motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. 2) Memorandum in support of PLRA motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Upon consideration of the request for leave to proceed as a pauper on appeal, the appellants motion filed under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24, the district courts order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) certifying that the appeal was filed in bad faith, and the record on appeal, IT IS ORDERED that the motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED. The appellant has not identified a good faith issue that the district court erred in dismissing his case for failure to state a claim. The appellant shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days, or this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2450 0002 1929 8647.[7] [7160725] MWR [21-1711] (AG) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Appellant Donald L. Jackson Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [6] [7159922] [21-1711] (CAH) [Entered: 05/12/2021 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Prose motion filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [7159921] [21-1711] (CAH) [Entered: 05/12/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Donald L. Jackson leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 04/22/2021. [4] [7155767] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/24/2021 [21-1711] (CAH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7155761] [21-1711] (AP) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Ms. French, Ms. Owen, Winningham, S. Morris [2] [7155760] [21-1711] (AP) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Donald L. Jackson by 04/27/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 05/06/2021. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/24/2021. [1] [7155751] [21-1711] (AP) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ms. Smith is a litigant

Latest cases where GEO GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron T. Craft