This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/21/2020 at 06:06:26 (UTC).

Donald Hennessey, Jr. v. Dollar Bank, FSB

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Donald Hennessey, Jr filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Dollar Bank, FSB. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3964

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

DOLLAR BANK, FSB

Plaintiff / Appellant

DONALD C. HENNESSEY, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert F. Prorok Esq.

Kelsey J. Gdovin Esq.

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Samuel J. Cordes Esq.

John E. Black Esq. III

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

13 #1

Mediation Instructions

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

Open Document

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Standing Order

Open Document #3

caption

Open Document #2

DC Memorandum 12/12/19

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John E. Black, III on behalf of Appellant(s) Donald C. Hennessey, Jr.. [19-3964] (JEB) [Entered: 01/24/2020 10:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Donald C. Hennessey, Jr. advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-3964] (SJC) [Entered: 01/23/2020 03:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Donald C. Hennessey, Jr.. [19-3964] (SJC) [Entered: 01/23/2020 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Donald C. Hennessey, Jr.. [19-3964] (SJC) [Entered: 01/23/2020 03:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel J. Cordes on behalf of Appellant(s) Donald Hennessey, Jr.. [19-3964] (SJC) [Entered: 01/23/2020 03:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FOLLOW UP LETTER to John E. Black, III, Esq. for Donald C. Hennessey, Jr. and Samuel J. Cordes, Esq. for Donald C. Hennessey, Jr. requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. Information Statement on or before 01/24/2020. Concise Summary on or before 01/24/2020. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 01/24/2020. (TMM) [Entered: 01/10/2020 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Dollar Bank, FSB. [19-3964] (KJG) [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kelsey J. Gdovin on behalf of Appellee(s) Dollar Bank, FSB. [19-3964] (KJG) [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert F. Prorok on behalf of Appellee(s) Dollar Bank, FSB. [19-3964] (KJG) [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppendix Citation Notice sent to John E. Black, III, Esq., Samuel J. Cordes, Esq., Kelsey J. Gdovin, Esq., Robert F. Prorok, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 01/08/2020. (TMM) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Donald C. Hennessey, Jr. in District Court No. 2-18-cv-00977. (TMM) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less