This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2020 at 06:13:29 (UTC).

Donald East v. Warden Robert Dooley, et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Donald East filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Warden Robert Dooley. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3113

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

LPN Brittany Huber

LPN Janelle Bastemeyer

CO Mastalir

Warden Robert Dooley

Jane Does, 1 and 2 and 3

PA Karissa Zimmer

RN Dayna Klawitter

Warden Brent Fluke

Other Unknown Persons, and Entities in their individual and official capacities

CPL Ahrens

CPL Barta

Defendant / Appellee

PA Bradley Adams

Plaintiff / Appellant

Donald East

Springfield, SD 57062-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Katelyn A. Cook

Attorney at GUNDERSON & PALMER

506 Sixth Street, P.O. Box 8045

Rapid City, SD 57709-8045

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Donald East

Attorney at SOUTH DAKOTA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

1412 Wood Street

Springfield, SD 57062-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:These appeals are consolidated and the courts order of October 30, 2020 called for the filing of Appellants BRIEF (emphasis added) by December 9. Appellant has submitted a separate brief for each appeal, totaling 54 pages in length. The briefs are stricken, and appellant is granted to December 22, 2020 to file a single, 30-page covering both cases. [4978053] [20-3113, 20-3144] (NDW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:41 PM]

Open Document #2

Affidavit of Warden Brent Fluke

Open Document #1

Michael E. Gans, East v. Dooley

Open Document

CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Donald East due 12/09/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4971336] [20-3113, 20-3144] (MMH) [Entered: 10/30/2020 11:40 AM]

Open Document

JUDGE ORDER: Denying [ # 4969551-2 ] motion for appointment of counsel. Adp Oct 2020 [4971329] [20-3113, 20-3144] (MMH) [Entered: 10/30/2020 11:32 AM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Letter to court

Open Restricted Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #1

Court correspondence

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

cover ltr

Open Document #1

Motion to Appoint Counsel, env.

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Katelyn A. Cook for Appellee Mr. Bradley Adams w/service 10/15/2020 [4966089] [20-3113] (KAC) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:10 PM]

Open Document #2

Case Caption

Open Document #1

Letter From Clerk's Office

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: On the courts own motion, the briefing schedule is hereby vacated pending the determination of the filing fee in the consolidated case, 20-3144 Donald East v. Warden Robert Dooley, et al. [4965667] [20-3113] (MMH) [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:14 AM]

Open Document

***VACATED / HELD IN ABEYANCE*** BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Donald East due 11/18/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4964309] [20-3113] [Edited 10/15/2020 by MMH] (MMH) [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:00 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Opinion and Order re motion to dismiss Brad Adams 9/18/20, Judgment of Dismissal re Adams 9/18/20, Opinion and Order re MSJ 9/30/20, and Judgment 9/30/20. [4964304] [20-3113] (MMH) [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:57 AM]

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:These appeals are consolidated and the courts order of October 30, 2020 called for the filing of Appellants BRIEF (emphasis added) by December 9. Appellant has submitted a separate brief for each appeal, totaling 54 pages in length. The briefs are stricken, and appellant is granted to December 22, 2020 to file a single, 30-page covering both cases. [4978053] [20-3113, 20-3144] (NDW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketTendered Appellant's Brief received from Appellant Mr. Donald East w/service 11/20/2020 [4978049] [20-3113]--[Edited 11/23/2020 by NDW] This brief is stricken pursuant to the order of this court dated November 20, 2020. (NDW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from Appellee Mr. Bradley Adams in 20-3113, Appellees Ahrens, Barta, Janelle Bastemeyer, Robert Dooley, Mr. Brent Fluke, Brittany Huber, Jane Does, Dayna Klawitter, Mastalir, Other Unknown Persons and Karissa Zimmer in 20-3144 regarding To correct misrepresentations in Inmate East correspondence filed on October 28, 2020.. w/service 11/10/2020 [4974516] [20-3113, 20-3144] LETTER - FOR CAL. [4974516] [20-3113, 20-3144]--[Edited 11/10/2020 by CMD] (FEG) [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Donald East due 12/09/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4971336] [20-3113, 20-3144] (MMH) [Entered: 10/30/2020 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE ORDER: Denying [ # 4969551-2 ] motion for appointment of counsel. Adp Oct 2020 [4971329] [20-3113, 20-3144] (MMH) [Entered: 10/30/2020 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from Appellant Donald East in 20-3113 regarding briefing schedule filing request. [4970788] [20-3113, 20-3144] (MMH) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTendered Case correspondence received from Appellant Mr. Donald East in 20-3113 w/service 10/28/2020 [4970692] [20-3113, 20-3144] (CRJ) [Entered: 10/28/2020 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for appointment of counsel, w/service 10/15/2020. [4969551] [20-3113, 20-3144] (MMH) [Entered: 10/26/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketTendered motion for appointment of counsel received from Appellant Mr. Donald East in 20-3113 [4969482] [20-3113, 20-3144] (CMH) [Entered: 10/26/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Katelyn A. Cook for Appellee Mr. Bradley Adams w/service 10/15/2020 [4966089] [20-3113] (KAC) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. [4966022] [20-3113] (MMH) [Entered: 10/15/2020 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: On the courts own motion, the briefing schedule is hereby vacated pending the determination of the filing fee in the consolidated case, 20-3144 Donald East v. Warden Robert Dooley, et al. [4965667] [20-3113] (MMH) [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***VACATED / HELD IN ABEYANCE*** BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Donald East due 11/18/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4964309] [20-3113] [Edited 10/15/2020 by MMH] (MMH) [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Opinion and Order re motion to dismiss Brad Adams 9/18/20, Judgment of Dismissal re Adams 9/18/20, Opinion and Order re MSJ 9/30/20, and Judgment 9/30/20. [4964304] [20-3113] (MMH) [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [4964288] [20-3113] (MMH) [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less